EP4031271 - STIRRER APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MIXING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EKATO Rühr- und Mischtechnik GmbH Hohe-Flum-Strasse 37 79650 Schopfheim / DE | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENZ, Andreas Hauptstraße 72 79650 Schopfheim / DE | 02 /
KELLER, Wolfgang 11, Rue du Chemin Neuf 68128 Village Neuf / FR | 03 /
HIMMELSBACH, Werner Felixstraße 3 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | 04 /
LAST, Wolfgang Danzigerstr. 42 79539 Lörrach / DE | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 20774907.8 | 11.09.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020EP75442 | Priority number, date | DE201910124886 | 16.09.2019 Original published format: DE102019124886 | [2022/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021052880 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4031271 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01F7/16, B01F7/00, B01D9/00 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
B01F27/1123 (EP,US);
B01F27/808 (EP,KR,US);
B01F27/091 (EP,KR,US);
B01F27/1125 (EP,KR,US);
B01F27/113 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Title | German: | RÜHRORGANVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHMISCHUNG | [2022/30] | English: | STIRRER APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MIXING | [2022/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF À ORGANE D'AGITATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE MÉLANGE INTIME | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 30.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR1287857 (VATERLAND WERK FRIEDRICH HERFE) [X] 1-3,5-7,10,12-15 * page 1, column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 2, column 2, paragraph 6 - page 3, column 1, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-10 *; | [XA]US3531092 (PRASCHAK GERALD H, et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-10,12-15 * column 1, line 12 - line 28 * * column 3, line 4 - line 10 * * column 3, line 32 - line 45 * * figure 2 * [A] 3,5,6,11; | [XA]EP0323375 (MORITZ SA [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9,11-15 * column 1, line 3 - line 25 * * column 3, line 24 - column 5, line 28 * * figure - *[A] 4,7,10; | [XA]EP0439689 (BOHLE L B PHARMATECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,10,12-15 * column 1, line 1 - line 3 * * column 2, line 41 - line 48 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 32 * * figures 1,5-8 * [A] 4,7,9,11; | [XA]WO2011122370 (FREUND CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,10,12-15 * abstract * * figure - * [A] 5-9,11; | [XA]KR20130045162 (AKIRA KIKO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6,11-15 * figures 1,3,4 * [A] 4,7-10 |