EP4041709 - COMPOUNDS FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONTENEGRO, Elvira Horazweg 5 69469 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
MUJICA-FERNAUD, Teresa C/ Álvarez de Lugo 38 38004 Santa Cruz de Tenerife / ES | 03 /
TUFFIN, Rachel 14 Monmouth Close Chandlers Ford SO53 4SY / GB | 04 /
VOGES, Frank Weidplatz 2 67098 Bad Duerkheim / DE | 05 /
PARHAM, Amir Hossain Roemischer Ring 26 60486 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 06 /
COMELY, Alexander Christian Baldiri Reixac 10 08208 Barcelona / ES | 07 /
MORAGAS SOLA, Antoni Baldiri Reixac 10 08028 Barcelona / ES | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Merck Patent Association Merck Patent GmbH 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 20774934.2 | 16.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020EP75790 | Priority number, date | EP20190202698 | 11.10.2019 Original published format: EP 19202698 | [2022/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021069184 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4041709 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/32, C07D307/36, C07D333/08, C07D409/10, H01L51/00 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
C07D207/32 (EP);
C07D333/78 (CN,KR,US);
C07D487/10 (US);
C07B59/002 (CN);
C07D209/70 (US);
C07D209/96 (CN);
C07D307/36 (EP);
C07D307/94 (CN,KR,US);
C07D333/08 (EP);
C07D405/04 (CN);
C07D405/10 (CN);
C07D405/12 (CN,KR);
C07D405/14 (CN);
C07D409/10 (EP,CN,KR);
C07D409/12 (CN,KR);
C07D409/14 (CN);
C07D413/10 (CN);
C07D493/10 (KR);
C07D495/10 (KR);
C07D495/20 (KR);
C08G83/003 (CN);
C09K11/06 (CN);
H10K50/00 (CN);
H10K50/11 (CN,US);
H10K50/15 (CN,KR,US);
H10K85/615 (CN,KR);
H10K85/624 (CN);
H10K85/626 (CN);
H10K85/631 (CN);
H10K85/633 (CN,KR);
H10K85/636 (CN,KR);
H10K85/6572 (CN,KR,US);
H10K85/6574 (CN,KR,US);
H10K85/6576 (CN,KR,US);
C07B2200/05 (CN);
C09K2211/1011 (CN);
C09K2211/1014 (CN);
C09K2211/1029 (CN);
C09K2211/1092 (CN);
C09K2211/1096 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2022/33] | English: | COMPOUNDS FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICES | [2022/33] | French: | COMPOSÉS POUR DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 08.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US2007092755 |