EP4041837 - ADHESIVE TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2023 [2023/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Certoplast Technische Klebebänder GmbH Müngstener Straße 10 42285 Wuppertal / DE | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMBUSCH, René August-Jung-Weg 10 42113 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
LEERMANN, Timo Erbschlöer Straße 77 42369 Wuppertal / DE | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20775235.3 | 16.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020EP75833 | Priority number, date | DE201920105633U | 11.10.2019 Original published format: DE 202019105633 U | [2022/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021069185 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4041837 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/21, C08G63/183, C08L67/00 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
C08G63/183 (EP,CN);
C09J7/21 (EP,CN,US);
C08L67/00 (EP);
C08L77/00 (EP);
C09J2203/302 (EP,CN,US);
C09J2301/16 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Validation states | MA | 06.04.2022 | Title | German: | KLEBEBAND | [2022/33] | English: | ADHESIVE TAPE | [2022/33] | French: | RUBAN ADHÉSIF | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 06.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/19] | 21.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1136535 (CERTOPLAST VORWERK & SOHN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0005] , [0006] , [0014] - paragraphs [0021] , [0025] , [0031] , [0032] , [0033] , [0040] , [0041]; figure -; claims 1-7,9 *; | [Y]DE202017106797U (PELLOPLAST OY [FI]) [Y] 7-10 * abstract ** paragraphs [0037] , [0039] , [0043]; claim 1 *; | [YD]DE202019100588U (CERTOPLAST TECHNISCHE KLEBEBAENDER GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0019] , [0022]; claims 1-3,6,8,9,13,15 * | by applicant | DE60031332T | DE202012103975U | DE202017106797U | DE202019100588U |