EP4213740 - KIT FOR COLLECTING SALIVA SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Procomcure Biotech GmbH Breitwies 1 5303 Thalgau / AT | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLERSTORFER, Daniel 5204 Strasswalchen / AT | 02 /
ÖNDER, Kamil 5301 Eugendorf / AT | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 20775290.8 | 18.09.2020 | [2023/30] | WO2020EP76183 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022058023 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4213740 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00, C12Q1/6806, C12Q1/70 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
C12Q1/70 (EP,KR);
A61B10/0051 (EP,KR);
C12Q1/701 (US);
C12Q1/6806 (EP,KR);
C12Q1/6844 (US);
G01N1/34 (US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2523/113, C12Q2527/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Title | German: | KIT ZUR SAMMLUNG VON SPEICHELPROBEN | [2023/30] | English: | KIT FOR COLLECTING SALIVA SAMPLES | [2023/30] | French: | KIT POUR COLLECTER DES ÉCHANTILLONS DE SALIVE | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 16.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2018132827 (SPECTRUM SOLUTIONS L L C [US]); | [XYI]US2018235206 (LAUGHLIN MARY [US], et al); |