EP3945992 - STEERABLE INSTRUMENT COMPRISING A HINGE WITH A SLOTTED STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fortimedix Assets II B.V. Urmonderbaan 22, Gebouw 250 6167 RD Geleen / NL | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THISSEN, Mattheus Hendrik Louis Raaystraat 1a 6071 NC Swalmen / NL | 02 /
VERBEEK, Marcel Antonius Elisabeth Bergseweg 71 6367 HA Voerendaal / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
THISSEN, Mattheus Hendrik Louis 6071 NC Swalmen / NL | ||
02 /
VERBEEK, Marcel Antonius Elisabeth 6367 HA Voerendaal / NL | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20775429.2 | 01.04.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020NL50221 | Priority number, date | NL20192022848 | 01.04.2019 Original published format: NL 2022848 | NL20192022849 | 01.04.2019 Original published format: NL 2022849 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020214027 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3945992 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/005, A61B1/008, A61B17/00, A61B34/30, A61B90/00, A61M25/00, A61M25/01 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A61B17/29 (EP,KR);
A61B17/00234 (CN,KR);
A61B17/3201 (US);
A61B17/32002 (US);
A61B34/71 (EP,KR);
A61M25/0136 (EP,KR);
A61M25/0138 (EP,KR);
A61M25/0147 (EP,KR);
A61B1/00078 (EP);
A61B1/0011 (EP);
A61B1/0055 (EP);
A61B2017/00292 (CN);
A61B2017/003 (EP);
A61B2017/00305 (CN);
A61B2017/00309 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/00314 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B2017/00323 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/00526 (US);
A61B2017/2906 (EP,KR);
A61B2017/2908 (KR);
A61B2017/3445 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | LENKBARES INSTRUMENT MIT EINEM SCHARNIER MIT EINER GESCHLITZTEN STRUKTUR | [2022/06] | English: | STEERABLE INSTRUMENT COMPRISING A HINGE WITH A SLOTTED STRUCTURE | [2022/06] | French: | INSTRUMENT ORIENTABLE COMPRENANT UNE CHARNIÈRE DOTÉE D'UNE STRUCTURE À FENTES | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 22.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2004103430 (USGI MEDICAL INC [US], et al); | [XI]US2006199999 (IKEDA MICHAEL H [US], et al); | [XI]WO2008139768 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP], et al); | [X]US2009124857 (VIOLA FRANK J [US]); | [A]US2011295065 (GURUSAMY JAY [US], et al); | [A]US2015352728 (WANG WEN [CN]) | by applicant | WO2004103430 | US2006199999 | EP1708609 | WO2008139768 | US2009124857 | WO2009112060 | WO2009127236 | EP2762058 | WO2016089202 | WO2018067004 | NL2021823B | EP20080004373 | WO2019NL50680 |