EP4029007 - ACTIVE NOISE REDUCTION AUDIO DEVICES AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bose Corporation 100 The Mountain Rd. MS 3B1 Framingham, MA 01701-9168 / US | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINICH, David R. c/o Bose Corporation The Mountain, MS 3B1 Framingham, Massachusetts 01701-9168 / US | 02 /
KU, Emery M. c/o Bose Corporation The Mountain, MS 3B1 Framingham, Massachusetts 01701-9168 / US | 03 /
DELHOUME, Alexia c/o Bose Corporation The Mountain, Ms 3B1 Framingham, Massachusetts 01701-9168 / US | 04 /
GELBERGER, Michelle c/o Bose Corporation The Mountain, MS 3B1 Framingham, Massachusetts 01701-9168 / US | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Attali, Pascal Bose Intellectual Property 18, rue de la Bucherie 75005 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | Attali, Pascal BOSE Intellectual Property 26-28 avenue de Winchester 78100 Saint-Germain-en-Laye / FR | Application number, filing date | 20775543.0 | 08.09.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020US49708 | Priority number, date | US201916565293 | 09.09.2019 Original published format: US201916565293 | [2022/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021050424 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029007 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/178, H04R1/10, H04R5/033, H04R5/04 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
G10K11/1783 (EP);
H04R1/1083 (EP,CN);
H04R3/04 (US);
H04R1/1016 (EP);
H04R1/1041 (EP);
H04R3/00 (CN);
H04R5/033 (US);
H04R5/04 (EP,US);
G10K11/17881 (EP);
G10K11/17885 (EP);
G10K2210/1081 (EP,US);
G10K2210/3026 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | AKTIVE GERÄUSCHVERMINDERUNGSAUDIOVORRICHTUNGEN UND -SYSTEME | [2022/29] | English: | ACTIVE NOISE REDUCTION AUDIO DEVICES AND SYSTEMS | [2022/29] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET SYSTÈMES AUDIO DE RÉDUCTION ACTIVE DU BRUIT | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 09.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2011116643 (TISCARENO VICTOR [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * figures 1,2,8,9,11,12 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0028] , [0030] - [0034] - [0036] , [0042] , [0043] , [0047] ** paragraphs [0048] - [0053] - [0060] - [0073] *; | [XAY]US2018206022 (HSIEH PEI-WEN [TW]) [X] 1-5,8-12,14,19,20 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0021] - [0023] , [00250034] , [0040] , [0041] * [A] 6,7,13,16,17 [Y] 1-5,8-12,14,18-20; | [XYI]US2018249265 (TERMEULEN RYAN [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12,14,15,19,20 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0020] , [0021] , [0033] - [0035] - [0036] - [0061] - [0066] - [0069] * [Y] 1-20 [I] 7,13,16,17 | by applicant | US8798283 | US9949017 | US10096313 |