EP4038574 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING IMAGE CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital CE Patent Holdings, SAS 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | [2023/36] |
Former [2022/32] | For all designated states InterDigital VC Holdings France, SAS 975, avenue des Champs Blancs 35576 Cesson-Sevigne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOYEN, Didier c/o Interdigital 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 CESSON-SEVIGNE / FR | 02 /
GALPIN, Franck c/o Interdigital 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 CESSON-SEVIGNE / FR | 03 /
BOISSON, Guillaume c/o Interdigital 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 CESSON-SEVIGNE / FR | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Interdigital Immeuble ZEN 2 845 A, avenue des Champs Blancs 35510 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/32] | Interdigital 975, avenue des Champs Blancs 35576 Cesson-Sévigné Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 20775889.7 | 29.09.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020EP77179 | Priority number, date | EP20190306245 | 30.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19306245 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021063919 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4038574 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/579, G06T7/593, H04N19/597, H04N13/111 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
G06T7/579 (EP,CN);
H04N13/122 (EP,CN);
H04N13/178 (US);
G06T7/593 (EP,CN);
G06T7/596 (EP,CN,US);
H04N13/194 (US);
H04N13/243 (EP,CN,US);
H04N13/271 (US);
H04N13/282 (US);
H04N19/513 (US);
H04N19/597 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,CN,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,CN);
G06T2207/10021 (EP,CN);
G06T2207/10024 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON BILDINHALTEN | [2022/32] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING IMAGE CONTENT | [2022/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE CONTENU D'IMAGE | [2022/32] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 24.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2010037512 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) |