EP4025380 - METHOD FOR RELIEVING STRESSES BY ROTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREITTMAYER, Elliott Archibald SAFRAN c/o Centre d'Excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau 77550 MOISSY CRAMAYEL / FR | 02 /
GARDY, David SAFRAN c/o Centre d'Excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau 77550 MOISSY CRAMAYEL / FR | 03 /
BASTIDE, Jocelyn SAFRAN c/o Centre d'Excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau 77550 MOISSY CRAMAYEL / FR | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25 rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20775916.8 | 02.09.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020FR51521 | Priority number, date | FR20190009731 | 04.09.2019 Original published format: FR 1909731 | [2022/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021044098 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4025380 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23P9/00, C21D7/00, C21D10/00, C21D11/00, F01D5/00, F01D5/02, G01M1/22, G01M5/00, C21D1/18, C21D8/00, G01B7/16, G01B11/16 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
B23P9/00 (EP,CN);
C21D10/00 (EP,CN,US);
B04B5/00 (US);
B23P25/00 (US);
C21D11/00 (EP,CN);
F01D5/00 (EP);
F01D5/02 (CN);
F04D29/18 (CN);
G01B11/105 (US);
G01B11/16 (EP,CN);
G01B7/125 (US);
G01B7/22 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ABBAU VON SPANNUNGEN DURCH ROTATION | [2022/28] | English: | METHOD FOR RELIEVING STRESSES BY ROTATION | [2022/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RELAXATION DES CONTRAINTES PAR ROTATION | [2022/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 04.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1026815 (COSTES ROBERT) [A] 1-9 * page 1 * * page 1; figure - *; | [A]EP1611976 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0023] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2010212422 (ALLEN JEFFREY SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0005] , [0010] , [0011] , [0014] , [0028] , [0035] * * figure - *; | [IA]US2013211743 (LEROUX ANDRE [FR]) [I] 8 * paragraphs [0006] , [0018] , [0019] * * figure 2 * [A] 1-7,9; | [A]FR3058920 (SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES [FR]) [A] 8 * figures 1-4 * * page 1, lines 15-25 ** page 5, lines 7-8 * |