EP4025461 - TRANSPARENT TRAILER ARTICULATION VIEW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT, CZ, RO | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Autonomous Mobility US, LLC 6307 Carpinteria Avenue, Suite A Carpinteria, CA 93101 / US | [2022/47] |
Former [2022/28] | For all designated states Continental Advanced Lidar Solutions US, LLC 6307 Carpinteria Avenue, Suite A Carpinteria, CA 93101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASTRO, Aranza Hinojosa 1 Continental Drive Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326 / US | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20775990.3 | 04.09.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020US49447 | Priority number, date | US201962895745P | 04.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962895745 P | [2022/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021046379 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4025461 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4025461 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/00 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
B60R1/003 (EP,US);
B60R1/26 (EP,US);
H04N23/698 (US);
H04N5/265 (US);
H04N7/183 (US);
B60R2300/105 (EP,US);
B60R2300/202 (EP);
B60R2300/303 (EP,US);
B60R2300/304 (US);
B60R2300/60 (US);
B60R2300/605 (EP);
B60R2300/802 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCHSICHTIGE ANHÄNGERGELENKSICHT | [2022/28] | English: | TRANSPARENT TRAILER ARTICULATION VIEW | [2022/28] | French: | VUE D'ARTICULATION DE REMORQUE TRANSPARENTE | [2022/28] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 10.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2023 | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/34] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014130049 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US]) [A] 1,6,7,13,14* paragraph [0058]; figures 4, 7 *; | [X]GB2541906 (JAGUAR LAND ROVER LTD [GB]) [X] 1-14 * figures 3c, 11; claim 1 *; | [X]US2019126851 (GREENWOOD JEREMY [GB]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0057]; figure - * |