EP4025107 - PORTABLE SUCTION UNIT AND VACUUM CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/28] | PORTABLE SUCTION ASSEMBLY AND SUCTION DEVICE | ||
[2024/09] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sauber.Io GmbH Zum Quellenpark 38 65812 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHER, Victor Zum Quellenpark 38 65812 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Borbach, Markus Dr. Borbach Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Liebigstraße 20 60323 Frankfurt / DE | [2024/31] |
Former [2022/28] | Borbach, Markus Dr. Borbach Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Liebigstraße 51 60323 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 20776068.7 | 05.09.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020EP00148 | Priority number, date | DE201910124002 | 06.09.2019 Original published format: DE102019124002 | [2022/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021043433 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4025107 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4025107 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/12, B01D46/24, A47L9/24 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
A47L9/12 (EP);
A47L9/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARES SAUGAGGREGAT UND SAUGGERÄT | [2022/28] | English: | PORTABLE SUCTION UNIT AND VACUUM CLEANER | [2024/09] | French: | UNITÉ D'ASPIRATION PORTABLE ET DISPOSITIF D'ASPIRATION | [2024/09] |
Former [2022/28] | PORTABLE SUCTION ASSEMBLY AND SUCTION DEVICE | ||
Former [2022/28] | ENSEMBLE D'ASPIRATION PORTABLE ET APPAREIL D'ASPIRATION | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 19.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 11.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | 03.01.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 03.01.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.01.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5795358 (SCANLON JOHN J [US], et al); | [XA]EP0955003 (KAERCHER GMBH & CO ALFRED [DE]); | [A]EP2421630 (KAERCHER GMBH & CO KG ALFRED [DE]) | by applicant | DE3722701 | DE20006284U | FR2861279 |