EP4034487 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A TEXTILE MACHINE PRODUCING CROSS-WOUND PACKAGES, AND A TEXTILE MACHINE PRODUCING CROSS-WOUND PACKAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saurer Spinning Solutions GmbH & Co. KG Carlstr. 60 52531 Übach-Palenberg / DE | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHELTER, Detlef Chlodwigstr. 15 41812 Erkelenz / DE | 02 /
KASPERS, Stephan Freudenbergstrasse 29 41748 Viersen / DE | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Schniedermeyer, Markus Saurer Spinning Solutions GmbH & Co. KG Patentabteilung Carlstraße 60 52531 Übach-Palenberg / DE | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 20776130.5 | 22.09.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020EP76348 | Priority number, date | DE201910125672 | 24.09.2019 Original published format: DE102019125672 | [2022/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021058446 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4034487 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4034487 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65H54/26, B65H63/00, B65H67/04, D01H9/02, D01H4/44 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
B65H54/26 (EP,CN,US);
B65H67/0411 (CN);
B65H63/00 (EP);
B65H67/04 (EP);
B65H67/0405 (US);
B65H67/0417 (CN);
B65H67/081 (CN);
D01H15/00 (US);
D01H4/44 (EP);
D01H9/02 (EP,US);
D01H9/04 (US);
B65H2406/35 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/31] | B65H54/26, B65H63/00, B65H67/04, D01H9/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER KREUZSPULEN HERSTELLENDEN TEXTILMASCHINE UND EINE KREUZSPULEN HERSTELLENDE TEXTILMASCHINE | [2022/31] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A TEXTILE MACHINE PRODUCING CROSS-WOUND PACKAGES, AND A TEXTILE MACHINE PRODUCING CROSS-WOUND PACKAGES | [2022/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE MACHINE TEXTILE PRODUISANT DES BOBINES CROISÉES ET MACHINE TEXTILE PRODUISANT DES BOBINES CROISÉES | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 25.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | MC | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | LU | 22.09.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | DK | 02.08.2023 | |
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
LU | 22.09.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | DK | 02.08.2023 | |
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | DK | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE102006047288 (OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-6 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] *; | [A]EP3168179 (SAURER GERMANY GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - [0016] , [0017] , [0048] *; | [A]EP3533739 (SAURER SPINNING SOLUTIONS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-6* sentence C, paragraphs 1-7,15-23 * | by applicant | DE10139075 | DE102006047288 |