EP3947379 - COMBINATIONS USEFUL IN A METHOD FOR TREATING SARCOMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PTC Therapeutics, Inc. 100 Corporate Court South Plainfield, NJ 07080 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEETALL, Marla, L. 70 Burnham Parkway Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | 02 /
CAO, Liangxian 17 Winesap Drive East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | 03 /
SHEEDY, Josephine 114 Andrews Drive Bordentown, NJ 08505 / US | 04 /
SPIEGEL, Robert 400 Elm Street Westfield, NJ 08090 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
WEETALL, Marla, L. Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | ||
02 /
CAO, Liangxian East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | |||
03 /
SHEEDY, Josephine Bordentown, NJ 08505 / US | |||
04 /
SPIEGEL, Robert Westfield, NJ 08090 / US | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20776386.3 | 27.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US25532 | Priority number, date | US201962825017P | 27.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962825017 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020198705 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3947379 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D403/04, C07D487/04, A61P35/00, A61K31/475, A61K31/337, A61K31/506, A61K31/655, A61K31/704, A61K45/06 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/506 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,IL);
A61K31/475 (EP,IL);
A61K31/655 (EP,IL);
A61K31/704 (EP,IL);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/337, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/475, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/506, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/655, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2022/06] | C07D471/04, C07D403/04, C07D487/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONEN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SARKOM | [2022/06] | English: | COMBINATIONS USEFUL IN A METHOD FOR TREATING SARCOMA | [2022/06] | French: | COMBINAISONS UTILES DANS UN PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DU SARCOME | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 11.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 20.07.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 20.07.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.07.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 20.07.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 20.07.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.07.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008075330 (GABIZON ALBERTO A [IL]) [A] 10 * claims *; | [XI]WO2014081906 (PTC THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-9,11 * 15th compound; page 188 * * page 71, line 30 - page 72, line 4 * * page 90, line 5 * * page 85, line 16 - page 89, line 12 * * page 92, line 17 - line 21 * [I] 3,4,10; | [E]WO2020185648 (PTC THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [E] 1,2,5-9,11 * paragraph [0116] * * claim 1 * * paragraph [0136] * * paragraph [0140] * * paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0108] *; | [A] - Grenader Tal ET AL, "Long-term response to pegylated liposomal doxorubicin in patients with metastatic soft tissue sarcomas", (20090131), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/19342997, (20221108), XP055978813 [A] 10 * the whole document * | [T] - JERNIGAN FINITH ET AL, "Preclinical and Early Clinical Development of PTC596, a Novel Small-Molecule Tubulin-Binding Agent", MOLECULAR CANCER THERAPEUTICS, US, vol. 20, no. 10, doi:10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-20-0774, ISSN 1535-7163, (20210726), pages 1846 - 1857, URL: https://aacrjournals.org/mct/article-pdf/20/10/1846/3198620/1846.pdf, XP055978456 [T] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-20-0774 | [T] - Andrew Brian ET AL, "A phase 1b study of unesbulin (PTC596) plus dacarbazine for the treatment of patients with locally recurrent, unresectable, or metastatic relapsed/refractory leiomyosarcoma", (20220601), URL: https://aacrjournals.org/cancerres/article/79/13_Supplement/292/542743/Abstract-292-PTC596-combination-therapy-for, (20221107), XP055978417 [T] 1-11 * the whole document * | [T] - WEETALL MARLA ET AL, "Abstract 292: PTC596 combination therapy for sarcoma", CANCER RESEARCH, 2019 San Antonio Breast Cancer Symposium, San Antonio, Texas, (20190701), vol. 79, no. 13_Supplement, doi:10.1158/1538-7445.AM2019-292, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 292 - 292, XP055978806 [T] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1538-7445.AM2019-292 | International search | [A]US3978055 (FAURAN CLAUDE P, et al) [A] 1-11* entire document *; | [A]WO0247690 (CYTOVIA INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * entire document *; | [X]US2015315182 (LEE CHANG-SUN [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * entire document especially para [0001]; [0011];[0251]; [0110]; [0264] *; | [PX]US2020024260 (LEE CHANG-SUN [US], et al) [P] 1-11 * entire document especially abstract; para [0001]; [0005]; [0109] * [X] ; | [PX]WO2020055544 (PTC THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [P] 1-11 * entire document especially claims 1-5 * [X] |