EP3952399 - METHOD EXECUTABLE BY USER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | For all designated states FG INNOVATION COMPANY LIMITED Flat 2623, 26/F Tuen Mun Central Square 22 Hoi Wing Road, Tuen Mun New Territories Hong Kong / HK | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8522 / JP | ||
For all designated states FG INNOVATION COMPANY LIMITED Flat 2623, 26/F Tuen Mun Central Square 22 Hoi Wing Road, Tuen Mun New Territories Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Chao c/o SHARP UNIVERSAL TECHNOLOGY (SHANGHAI) CO., LTD. No. 1111, Jinhai Rd., Pudong Shanghai 201206 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Renmao c/o SHARP UNIVERSAL TECHNOLOGY (SHANGHAI) CO., LTD. No. 1111, Jinhai Rd., Pudong Shanghai 201206 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
LUO, Chao Shanghai 201206 / CN | ||
02 /
LIU, Renmao Shanghai 201206 / CN | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20777039.7 | 25.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020CN81143 | Priority number, date | CN201910246454 | 28.03.2019 Original published format: CN201910246454 | [2022/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020192695 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3952399 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L1/18, // H04L5/00 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
H04L1/1896 (EP);
H04W72/121 (CN);
H04W72/1263 (US);
H04L1/1822 (EP);
H04W24/02 (CN);
H04W72/02 (US);
H04W72/20 (EP,US);
H04W72/30 (US);
H04L2001/0093 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | H04W24/02, H04W72/12, H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | DURCH EIN BENUTZERGERÄT AUSFÜHRBARES VERFAHREN | [2022/06] | English: | METHOD EXECUTABLE BY USER EQUIPMENT | [2022/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ EXÉCUTABLE PAR UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2021 | Translation filed | 21.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 11.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2020033088 (CONVIDA WIRELESS LLC [US]); | [E]EP3821658 (CONVIDA WIRELESS LLC [US]); | International search | [PX]CN110798297 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-4 * description, paragraphs [0025]-[0080], and figure 1 *; | [PX] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Discussion on Physical Layer Structure for NR Sidelink", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #97 R1-1907012, (20190517), doi:20200511123201PX, XP051728460 [PX] 1-4 * section 2 * | [PX] - SAMSUNG, "On Physical Layer Procedures for NR V2X", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #96bis R1-1904426, (20190412), doi:20200511122712PX, XP051707209 [PX] 1-4 * section 2 * | [PX] - SAMSUNG, "On Physical Layer Procedures for NR V2X", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #97 R1-1906941, (20190517), doi:20200511122900PX, XP051728391 [PX] 1-4 * section 2 * | [X] - SAMSUNG, "On Physical Layer Procedures for NR V2X", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #96 R1-1902274, (20190301), doi:20200511122106X, XP051599969 [X] 1-4 * section 2 * | [X] - CATT, "Support of Unicast, Groupcast and Broadcast in NR Sidelink", 3GPP TSG RAN1 Meeting #94bis R1-1810539, (20181012), doi:20200511140138X, XP051517947 [X] 1-10 * sections 2 and 3 * | [Y] - SAMSUNG, "On Physical Layer Procedures for NR V2X", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #96 R1-1902274, (20190301), doi:20200511140049X, XP051599969 [Y] 1-4 * section 2 * | [Y] - CATT, "Support of Unicast, Groupcast and Broadcast in NR Sidelink", 3GPP TSG RAN1 Meeting #94bis R1-1810539, (20181012), doi:20200511140138X, XP051517947 [Y] 1-4 * sections 2 and 3 * |