EP3943567 - PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Shigeki c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
NIWA, Masahito c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
WATANABE, Shigeki Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | ||
02 /
NIWA, Masahito Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20777440.7 | 12.03.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020JP10689 | Priority number, date | JP20190054306 | 22.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019054306 | [2022/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020195864 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3943567 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/38 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
C09J7/383 (EP,US);
C09J7/38 (KR);
C08K5/29 (US);
C09J11/08 (US);
C09J199/00 (KR);
C09J7/25 (KR);
C09J7/255 (US);
C08K2201/019 (US);
C09J2203/326 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2301/124 (KR,US);
C09J2301/302 (EP,US);
C09J2301/312 (KR);
C09J2407/00 (EP,US);
C09J2433/00 (US);
C09J2451/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | C09J199/00, C09J7/25, C09J7/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | DRUCKEMPFINDLICHE HAFTFOLIE | [2022/04] | English: | PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE SHEET | [2022/04] | French: | FEUILLE ADHÉSIVE SENSIBLE À LA PRESSION | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2021 | Translation filed | 07.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 06.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/47] | 07.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013344345 (SAKELLARIDES STEFANOS L [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract ** paragraphs [0024] , [0048]; claims 1,9,14 *; | [X]US2014242377 (KÖPKE TILLMANN [DE], et al) [X] 1-8,10,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0067]; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US2016280847 (MÜSSIG BERNHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0082] - [0084] - [0098] , [0109] , [0110]; claims 1-6,17,18 *; | [E]EP3674377 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [E] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0083] , [0092] , [0111] , [0112] , [0116] , [0117]; claim 1 *; | [E]EP3929577 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [E] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0044] , [0045] , [0047] , [0051] , [0066] , [0068] , [0072]; claims 9,11 * | International search | [X]JP2005247402 (NIPPON RIKA SEISHI KK) [X] 1-14, 17-22; | [A]JP2006282752 (OJI PAPER CO) [A] 1-22; | [Y]WO2011010507 (NITOMS KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1-22; | [Y]JP2014196471 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [Y] 1-22; | [EA]JP2020041023 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [EA] 1-22; | [EA]JP2020050712 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [EA] 1-22; | [EA]JP2020050711 (NITTO DENKO CORP)[EA] 1-22 | by applicant | JPS5316725B | JPS614500B | WO2009079213 | JP2015221847 | WO2016186122 | JP2019054306 | - Chemische Technik, (19860000), vol. 38, no. 3, pages 116 - 119 |