EP3950304 - RESIN COMPOSITION, CURED MOLDED ARTICLE, FIBER-REINFORCED PLASTIC MOLDING MATERIAL, FIBER-REINFORCED PLASTIC, FIBER-REINFORCED PLASTIC LAMINATED MOLDED BODY, AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL Chemical & Material Co., Ltd. 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI Hiroyuki c/o NIPPON STEEL Chemical & Material Co., Ltd., 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 02 /
MUKUDAI Jun c/o NIPPON STEEL Chemical & Material Co., Ltd., 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 03 /
ANDOH Hideki c/o NIPPON STEEL Chemical & Material Co., Ltd., 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 04 /
FUJINO Kenichi c/o NIPPON STEEL Chemical & Material Co., Ltd., 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
TAKAHASHI Hiroyuki Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | ||
02 /
MUKUDAI Jun Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | |||
03 /
ANDOH Hideki Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | |||
04 /
FUJINO Kenichi Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | Representative(s) | Becker, Eberhard Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | Becker, Eberhard Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20777748.3 | 25.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP13322 | Priority number, date | JP20190057952 | 26.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019057952 | JP20190066082 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019066082 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020196617 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950304 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/28, B32B27/00, C08L69/00, C08L63/00, C08L71/10, C08J5/04, C08J5/24 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
B32B5/024 (EP);
B32B27/28 (CN);
C08J5/243 (EP,US);
B29C43/003 (EP);
B32B27/08 (CN,US);
B32B27/12 (US);
B32B27/20 (CN);
B32B27/365 (CN,US);
B32B37/12 (US);
B32B37/14 (EP);
B32B5/263 (EP);
B32B7/12 (US);
C08J5/042 (EP,CN);
C08L63/00 (EP);
C08L69/00 (EP,US);
C08L71/00 (EP);
C08L71/123 (US);
B29C43/02 (EP);
B29C43/52 (EP);
B32B2250/05 (EP);
B32B2250/20 (EP);
B32B2250/24 (CN);
B32B2250/42 (CN);
B32B2260/023 (EP);
B32B2260/046 (EP);
B32B2262/02 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (EP);
B32B2262/103 (EP);
B32B2262/105 (EP);
B32B2262/106 (EP,CN);
B32B2270/00 (EP);
B32B2307/306 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (EP);
B32B2307/542 (EP);
B32B2307/546 (EP);
B32B2419/00 (EP);
B32B2439/00 (EP);
B32B2457/00 (EP);
B32B2555/00 (EP);
B32B2605/08 (EP);
B32B2605/18 (EP);
C08G2650/56 (EP);
C08J2363/00 (EP,CN);
C08J2369/00 (EP,US);
C08J2371/00 (EP);
C08J2371/12 (CN,US);
C08J2463/00 (EP);
C08J2469/00 (EP,US);
C08J2471/00 (EP);
C08J2471/12 (US);
C08K7/06 (CN);
C08L2312/00 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L69/00 (EP);
C08L69/00, C08L63/00 (EP);
C08L69/00, C08L71/00 (EP);
C08L71/00, C08L69/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, GEHÄRTETER FORMARTIKEL, FASERVERSTÄRKTES KUNSTSTOFFFORMMATERIAL, FASERVERSTÄRKTER KUNSTSTOFF, FASERVERSTÄRKTER LAMINIERTER KUNSTSTOFFFORMKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2022/06] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION, CURED MOLDED ARTICLE, FIBER-REINFORCED PLASTIC MOLDING MATERIAL, FIBER-REINFORCED PLASTIC, FIBER-REINFORCED PLASTIC LAMINATED MOLDED BODY, AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2022/06] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE, ARTICLE MOULÉ DURCI, MATÉRIAU DE MOULAGE EN PLASTIQUE RENFORCÉ PAR DES FIBRES, PLASTIQUE RENFORCÉ PAR DES FIBRES, CORPS MOULÉ STRATIFIÉ EN PLASTIQUE RENFORCÉ PAR DES FIBRES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2021 | Translation filed | 16.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 21.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH05302025 (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD) [X] 1,3,4,6-8 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0007]; example Examples * [I] 2,5; | [XA]JP2006070065 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [X] 1-6 * example Examples * [A] 7-20; | [XA]JP2006104329 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [X] 1-6 * example Examples * [A] 7-20; | [XAI]JP2015081333 (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 1,3,4,6-8 * example Examples * [A] 12-20 [I] 2,5; | [IA]WO2018124215 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMIKIN CHEM CO [JP]) [I] 9,10,12 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0072] *[A] 11,13-20 | International search | [XA]JPH05302025 (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD) [X] 1, 3, 4, 6-8 * claims, paragraph [0007], examples * [A] 2, 5; | [A]JP2000177256 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 9-20 * claims *; | [A]US2003220036 (LEE ROBERT A [GB], et al) [A] 9-20* claims *; | [XA]JP2006070065 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [X] 1-6 * claims, examples * [A] 7, 8; | [XA]JP2006104329 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [X] 1-6 * claims, examples * [A] 7, 8; | [XA]JP2015081333 (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 1, 3, 4, 6-8 * claims, examples * [A] 2, 5; | [XA]WO2018124215 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMIKIN CHEM CO [JP]) [X] 9, 10, 12 * claims, paragraphs [0037], [0057], [0058], [0062]-[0072] * [A] 11, 13-20 | by applicant | JPS5626330B | JP2968388B | WO2005036597 | WO2016152856 | JP6278286B | WO2018124215 | JP2019057952 | JP2019066082 |