EP3947908 - DIAMOND HIGH TEMPERATURE SHEAR VALVE DESIGNED TO BE USED IN EXTREME THERMAL ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAKER HUGHES HOLDINGS LLC 17021 Aldine Westfield Houston, TX 77073 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREEN, Ryan Damont 17021 Aldine Westfield Houston, TX 77073 / US | 02 /
KRUSPE, Thomas 17021 Aldine Westfield Houston, TX 77073 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
GREEN, Ryan Damont Houston, TX 77073 / US | ||
02 /
KRUSPE, Thomas Houston, TX 77073 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 20777792.1 | 26.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US24840 | Priority number, date | US201916365998 | 27.03.2019 Original published format: US201916365998 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020198420 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3947908 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/24 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
E21B47/24 (EP);
E21B34/066 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | E21B47/18, E21B34/06, F16K11/07, F16K25/00, F16K27/04, F16K31/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | HOCHTEMPERATURSCHERVENTIL AUS DIAMANT ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EXTREMEN THERMISCHEN UMGEBUNGEN | [2022/06] | English: | DIAMOND HIGH TEMPERATURE SHEAR VALVE DESIGNED TO BE USED IN EXTREME THERMAL ENVIRONMENTS | [2022/06] | French: | VANNE À CISAILLEMENT HAUTE TEMPÉRATURE EN LOSANGE DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE DANS DES ENVIRONNEMENTS THERMIQUES EXTRÊMES | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 21.07.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001048091 (ENOMOTO SHIGEIKU [JP], et al); | [YA]WO2016187253 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]); | [XYI]WO2017156107 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) | International search | [A]US2005034454 (INNES FRANK [GB]); | [A]US2005045344 (FRASER SIMON BENEDICT [GB], et al); | [Y]US2016341001 (SCHOLZ ECKARD [DE], et al); | [Y]US2017260831 (GREEN RYAN DAMONT [US]); | [A]US2017260852 (GREEN RYAN DAMONT [US], et al) |