EP3946736 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR METABOLIC ASSESSMENT UTILIZING 1-METHOXY-PMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Selux Diagnostics Inc. 56 Roland Street, Suite 206 Charlestown, MA 02129 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPEARS, Benjamin 56 Roland Street Suite 206 Charle stown, Massachusetts 02129 / US | 02 /
FLYER, Alec N. 56 Roland Street Suite 206 Charle stown, Massachusetts 02129 / US | 03 /
STERN, Eric 56 Roland Street Suite 206 Charle stown, Massachusetts 02129 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
SPEARS, Benjamin stown, Massachusetts 02129 / US | ||
02 /
FLYER, Alec N. stown, Massachusetts 02129 / US | |||
03 /
STERN, Eric stown, Massachusetts 02129 / US | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20778297.0 | 27.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US25360 | Priority number, date | US201962824744P | 27.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962824744 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020198638 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3946736 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/04 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
C12Q1/18 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (EP,US);
C12Q1/025 (US);
C12Q1/045 (EP);
G01N21/6408 (EP,US);
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR METABOLISCHEN BEURTEILUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON 1-METHOXY-PMS | [2022/06] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR METABOLIC ASSESSMENT UTILIZING 1-METHOXY-PMS | [2022/06] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ÉVALUATION MÉTABOLIQUE À L'AIDE DE 1-MÉTHOXY-PMS | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 12.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2020223511 (SELUX DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [E] 1-6,9-15 * figure 13; example 11 *; | [I] - RASMUSSEN E S, "Use of fluorescent redox indicators to evaluate cell proliferation and viability", IN VITRO AND MOLECULAR TOXICOLOGY, MARY ANN LIEBERT, LARCHMONT, NY, US, (19990101), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 1097-9336, pages 47 - 58, XP002968560 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 49, paragraph 3 - column r * | International search | [Y]US5501959 (LANCASTER MICHAEL V [US], et al) [Y] 2-3 and 21-25 * , entire document esp abstract, col 21 *; | [XY]WO2018119439 (SELUX DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [X] 1, 19, 20, and 38-41 * , entire document esp para [0013], [0064]-[0065], [0119], [0385], * [Y] 2-3 and 21-25; | [AP]US2019300927 (SPEARS BENJAMIN [US], et al) [AP] 1-3, 19-25, 38-41* , entire document *; | [XP]WO2020014256 (SELUX DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [XP] 1 * , entire document * |