EP3951856 - INSULATED CIRCUIT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKANIWA, Yoshiaki c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION, Central Research Institute 600, Kitabukuro-cho 1-chome Omiya-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 330-8508 / JP | 02 /
OHASHI, Toyo c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION, Central Research Institute 600, Kitabukuro-cho 1-chome Omiya-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 330-8508 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
SAKANIWA, Yoshiaki Saitama-shi, Saitama 330-8508 / JP | ||
02 /
OHASHI, Toyo Saitama-shi, Saitama 330-8508 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20778482.8 | 26.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP13645 | Priority number, date | JP20190057990 | 26.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019057990 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020196746 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3951856 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/36, H05K1/02, H01L23/373, H01L33/64 | [2023/05] | CPC: |
H01L23/3735 (EP);
H01L23/538 (KR);
H05K1/032 (US);
C08L63/00 (EP);
H01L21/4846 (KR);
H01L23/3736 (KR);
H01L23/498 (EP);
H01L33/644 (EP);
H05K1/0203 (EP,US);
H05K1/0256 (EP,KR);
H05K1/0313 (KR);
H05K3/4092 (KR);
H01L23/36 (EP);
H01L33/647 (EP);
H05K2201/09045 (EP);
H05K3/0061 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | H01L23/36, H05K1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | ISOLIERTE LEITERPLATTE | [2022/06] | English: | INSULATED CIRCUIT BOARD | [2022/06] | French: | CARTE DE CIRCUIT ISOLÉE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2021 | Translation filed | 17.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 19.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH06169147 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND) [X] 1,3,4 * the whole document * [I] 2; | [A]US2002125563 (SCHEUERMANN UWE [DE]) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A]US2018005918 (NABA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] - [0043]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [Y]WO2012081434 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al)[Y] 1-4; | [Y]JP2018147934 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [Y] 1-4 | by applicant | JPH09135057 | JP2015207666 | JP2018101763 | JP2019057990 |