EP3951904 - DISPLAY ASSEMBLY AND VIRTUAL REALITY DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO., LTD. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Can No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Can No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
YUE, Han No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Ming No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 05 /
CONG, Ning No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 06 /
ZHAO, Jiao No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 07 /
XUAN, Minghua No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
WANG, Can Beijing 100176 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHANG, Can Beijing 100176 / CN | |||
03 /
YUE, Han Beijing 100176 / CN | |||
04 /
YANG, Ming Beijing 100176 / CN | |||
05 /
CONG, Ning Beijing 100176 / CN | |||
06 /
ZHAO, Jiao Beijing 100176 / CN | |||
07 /
XUAN, Minghua Beijing 100176 / CN | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20778514.8 | 18.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020CN79844 | Priority number, date | CN201910243939 | 28.03.2019 Original published format: CN201910243939 | [2022/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020192509 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3951904 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/52, H01L27/32, G02B27/01 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
G02B27/0172 (EP);
H10K50/858 (US);
H10K50/844 (US);
H10K59/873 (EP);
H10K59/879 (EP);
H10K59/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEANORDNUNG UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR VIRTUELLE REALITÄT | [2022/06] | English: | DISPLAY ASSEMBLY AND VIRTUAL REALITY DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2022/06] | French: | ENSEMBLE AFFICHEUR ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE DE RÉALITÉ VIRTUELLE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2020 | Translation filed | 01.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2020 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 16.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012199859 (SHIKINA NORIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0016] - [0037]; figure 1 *; | [XI]US2012217521 (OHTA TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7 * paragraphs [0106] , [0112] - [0143] - [ 0150] , [0177]; figures 1,2,3 * [I] 6,8; | [XAYI]US2018180888 (JUNG SUNGMIN [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0058] , [0062] - [0124]; figures 5,7,8 * [A] 6 [Y] 10 [I] 4,8,9; | [Y]CN108919493 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [Y] 10* paragraphs [0058] - [0063]; figure 5 *; | [X]CN106129260B (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0025] - [0036]; figure 1 * | International search | [X]JP2004039500 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-4, 8, 9 * description, paragraphs [0035]-[0046], and figures 1 and 2 *; | [Y]JP2004039500 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 5-7, 10 * description, paragraphs [0035]-[0046], and figures 1 and 2 *; | [A]CN102629622 (CANON KK) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [Y]CN106019599 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [Y] 5-7 * description, paragraphs [0035]-[0068], and figures 1-6 *; | [X]CN106129260 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1-4, 8, 9 * description, paragraphs [0025]-[0050], and figures 1-4 *; | [Y]CN106129260 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [Y] 5-7, 10 * description, paragraphs [0025]-[0050], and figures 1-4 *; | [Y]CN108919493 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [Y] 10 * description, paragraphs [0042]-[0062], and figures 1-5 *; | [PX]CN109841757 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0013]-[0037], and figures 1-3 * |