EP3948861 - DETERMINATION OF THE SIGNIFICANCE OF SPATIAL AUDIO PARAMETERS AND ASSOCIATED ENCODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAITINEN, Mikko-Ville Metsäpirtintie 2 C 15 02130 Espoo / FI | 02 /
VASILACHE, Adriana Vestonkatu 43 33580 Tampere / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
LAITINEN, Mikko-Ville 02130 Espoo / FI | ||
02 /
VASILACHE, Adriana 33580 Tampere / FI | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20778687.2 | 26.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020FI50194 | Priority number, date | GB20190004303 | 28.03.2019 Original published format: GB 201904303 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020193865 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3948861 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/008, G10L19/02, G06F16/683, H04S3/00, H04S7/00, G10L25/51 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
G10L19/008 (EP,GB,KR);
G10L19/02 (KR,US);
G10L25/06 (GB);
G06F16/683 (KR);
G10L25/21 (US);
H04S3/00 (KR);
H04S7/00 (KR);
G10L25/51 (EP);
H04S2420/03 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | G10L19/008, G10L19/02, G06F16/683, H04S3/00, H04S7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG DER BEDEUTUNG VON RÄUMLICHEN AUDIOPARAMETERN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE CODIERUNG | [2022/06] | English: | DETERMINATION OF THE SIGNIFICANCE OF SPATIAL AUDIO PARAMETERS AND ASSOCIATED ENCODING | [2022/06] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE L'IMPORTANCE DES PARAMÈTRES AUDIO SPATIAUX ET CODAGE ASSOCIÉ | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 04.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012158333 (DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP [US], et al); | [A]WO2013149671 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al); | [XAI]EP3451331 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [A]US2006233379 (VILLEMOES LARS [SE], et al) [A] * figs. 1-2; pars. 0010, 0056, 0059-0060, 0073-0077 *; | [A]EP2633520 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] * fig. 1; pars. 0009, 0024-0025, 0027-0031 *; | [XY]EP3451331 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1, 12 * figs. 1, 4A-4B; pars. 0070, 0073, 0084-0085, 0088-0090, 0096, 0104 * [Y] 2-11 , 13-22; | [YA] - NOKIA CORPORATION, "Proposal for MASA format", 3GPP TSG-SA4#102 meeting, S4-190121, (20190122), URL: https://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG4_CODEC/TSGS4_102_Bruges/Docs/S4-190121.zip, (20200703), XP051611932 [Y] 2-11 , 13-22 * pages 1-8 * [A] 1, 12 | by applicant | EP3451331 |