EP3951542 - AUTOMATIC TRAVEL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yanmar Power Technology Co., Ltd. 1-32, Chayamachi Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8311 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINUTA, Keishi c/o YANMAR AGRIBUSINESS CO., LTD. 1-9, Tsurunocho, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0014 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
KINUTA, Keishi Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0014 / JP | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20779448.8 | 12.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP10794 | Priority number, date | JP20190056329 | 25.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019056329 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020195890 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3951542 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/00 | [2024/34] | CPC: |
A01B69/008 (EP,KR,US);
G05D1/0061 (US);
G05D1/0219 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/46] | G05D1/02, A01B69/04 | ||
Former IPC [2022/06] | G05D1/02, A01B69/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES FAHRSYSTEM | [2022/06] | English: | AUTOMATIC TRAVEL SYSTEM | [2022/06] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉPLACEMENT AUTOMATIQUE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2021 | Translation filed | 15.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 27.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.07.2024 | 22.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2015119263 (YANMAR CO LTD [JP]); | [XY]JP2018099113 (KUBOTA KK); | [E]EP3940493 (YANMAR POWER TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [Y]WO2015119263 (YANMAR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JP2015181371 (YANMAR CO LTD, et al); | [XY]JP2018099113 (KUBOTA KK); | [A]JP2018117558 (KUBOTA KK); | [A]JP2019004816 (KUBOTA KK) | by applicant | JPH0217011U |