EP3950597 - TUNGSTEN OXIDE POWDER AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR TUNGSTEN OXIDE POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | For all designated states Toshiba Materials Co., Ltd. 8, Shinsugita-Cho Isogo-Ku Yokohama-Shi Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUSHI, Daisuke c/o Toshiba Materials Co., Ltd., 8, Shinsugita- cho, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP | 02 /
HIRABAYASHI, Hideaki c/o Toshiba Materials Co., Ltd., 8, Shinsugita- cho, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP | 03 /
SASAKI, Akito c/o Toshiba Materials Co., Ltd., 8, Shinsugita- cho, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP | 04 /
HIRAMATSU, Ryosuke c/o Toshiba Materials Co., Ltd., 8, Shinsugita- cho, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP | 05 /
SASAKI, Atsuya c/o Toshiba Materials Co., Ltd., 8, Shinsugita- cho, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP | 06 /
MOROOKA, Takaki c/o Toshiba Materials Co., Ltd., 8, Shinsugita- cho, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP | 07 /
MORI, Yoichiro c/o Toshiba Materials Co., Ltd., 8, Shinsugita- cho, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
FUKUSHI, Daisuke Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP | ||
02 /
HIRABAYASHI, Hideaki Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP | |||
03 /
SASAKI, Akito Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP | |||
04 /
HIRAMATSU, Ryosuke Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP | |||
05 /
SASAKI, Atsuya Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP | |||
06 /
MOROOKA, Takaki Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP | |||
07 /
MORI, Yoichiro Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20779607.9 | 26.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP13581 | Priority number, date | JP20190063830 | 28.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019063830 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020196720 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950597 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C01G41/02 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
C01G41/02 (EP,US);
C01P2004/04 (US);
C01P2004/50 (EP);
C01P2004/54 (EP);
C01P2004/60 (EP);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | WOLFRAMOXIDPULVER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WOLFRAMOXIDPULVER | [2022/06] | English: | TUNGSTEN OXIDE POWDER AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR TUNGSTEN OXIDE POWDER | [2022/06] | French: | POUDRE D'OXYDE DE TUNGSTÈNE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE POUDRE D'OXYDE DE TUNGSTÈNE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2021 | Translation filed | 15.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 14.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2015034149 (SASAKI AKITO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0076] - [0080] * [A] 6-13; | [XA]US2017256797 (SASAKI AKITO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0070]; claim - *[A] 6-13; | [YA]CN108862389 (SHANGHAI INST CERAMICS CAS) [Y] 1-5 * figure 5; example 2 * [A] 6-13; | [XI] - HAN W ET AL, "Synthesis of the hexagonal form of tungsten trioxide from peroxopolytungstate via ammonium paratungstate decahydrate", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN,NIPPON KAGAKUKAI, JP, (19980101), vol. 71, doi:10.1246/BCSJ.71.933, ISSN 0009-2673, pages 933 - 937, XP002483369 [X] 1-6,9-13 * "Experimental" * [I] 7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/bcsj.71.933 | [YA] - WEIWEI YU ET AL, "Improving gas sensing performance by oxygen vacancies in sub-stoichiometric WO 3?x", RSC ADVANCES, (20190101), vol. 9, no. 14, doi:10.1039/C9RA00116F, pages 7723 - 7728, XP055649616 [Y] 1-5 * Conclusion;; figure 2 * [A] 6-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C9RA00116F | International search | [A]CN1613777 (UNIV BEIJING SCIENCE & TECH [CN])[A] 1-13; | [A]CN101381106 (UNIV JIAOTONG SOUTHWEST [CN]) [A] 1-13; | [X]WO2014142066 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-3, 5-13; | [A]CN108439473 (UNIV KUNMING SCIENCE & TECH) [A] 1-13; | [A]WO2018216692 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-13; | [A] - HAN WONCHULL et al., Electrochemical Intercalation of Lithium into Hexagonal WO 3 Framework Obtained from Ammonium Paratun, (19981200), vol. 66, no. 12, pages 1230 - 1233, XP055508668 [A] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.1203543 | by applicant | WO2016039157 | WO2018199020 |