EP3908863 - THE MULTIPLE SCATTERING SYNTHESIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spectralics Ltd. 7 Shevah St. 6777937 Tel Aviv / IL | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALEK, Eran 29 Raziel St. 4247029 Netanya / IL | 02 /
KASHTER, Yuval Ben Yehuda 27, Apartment 1. 6380702 Tel Aviv / IL | 03 /
BAR-YOSEF, Ran Abraham 6 Shlomzion Hamalka St. 6226407 Tel Aviv / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
FALEK, Eran 4247029 Netanya / IL | ||
02 /
KASHTER, Yuval 6380702 Tel Aviv / IL | |||
03 /
BAR-YOSEF, Ran Abraham 6226407 Tel Aviv / IL | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20779620.2 | 24.03.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020IL50351 | Priority number, date | US201962822914P | 24.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962822914 P | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020194299 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3908863 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/00, G02B5/28 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
G02B1/002 (EP,US);
G01M11/0228 (US);
G02B5/20 (US);
G02B5/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/46] | G02B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | MEHRFACHSTREUUNGSSYNTHESEVERFAHREN | [2021/46] | English: | THE MULTIPLE SCATTERING SYNTHESIS METHOD | [2021/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE À DIFFUSION MULTIPLE | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 22.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2396436 (THALES PLC [GB]); | [X]US2005141093 (WEBER MICHAEL F [US]); | [A]US2011134515 (BANERJEE DEBASISH [US], et al); | [X]US2011279901 (WATANABE TADASHI [JP]); | International search | [A]US2005036738 (ZHOU YAN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * , para [0037] *; | [A]US2006014087 (WITTENBERG DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 23, 24* , para [0100], [0101], [0106], [0108] *; | [A]US2007285601 (HENDRIX KAREN D [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * , para [0012], [0042], [0045] *; | [A]US2013016030 (LIU RUOPENG [CN], et al) [A] 14-16, 21, 22 * , para [0043], [0044], [0046] *; | [A]US2014293467 (LAMDA GUARD TECHNOLOGIES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * , para [0037], [0066], [0074], [0076] *; | [XY]US2016252652 (SHEN YICHEN [US], et al) [X] 11-13, 17-20 * , Eq. 8, Fig. 2A, Fig. 21, para [0004], [0047], [0048], [0059], [0102], [0103], [0133], [0135], [0138] * [Y] 1-10, 14-16, 21-24 |