EP3867626 - SPECTRAL UNMIXING OF FLUORESCENCE IMAGING USING RADIOFREQUENCY-MULTIPLEXED EXCITATION DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 15.08.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive, MC110 Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417 / US | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OWSLEY, Keegan 388 Virginia Ave. Campbell, California 95008 / US | 02 /
BAHR, Matthew 185 Mohave Cmn. Fremont, California 94539 / US | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 20779641.8 | 12.03.2020 | [2021/34] | WO2020US22421 | Priority number, date | US201962822789P | 22.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962822789 P | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020197787 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3867626 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/14, G01N21/64, G01N15/10, G01N15/02, G01N33/569, G06T5/00, G06V20/69, G06V10/42 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
G01N15/1459 (EP,US);
C12Q1/02 (US);
G01N15/14 (US);
G01N21/6428 (US);
G01N33/56966 (EP);
G06T5/73 (EP);
G06T7/0014 (US);
G06V10/431 (EP,US);
G06V20/693 (EP,US);
G06V20/695 (EP,US);
G01N15/149 (EP,US);
G01N2015/1006 (EP);
G01N2015/1477 (EP);
G01N2021/6439 (US);
G06T2207/10024 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/34] | G01N15/14, G01N21/64, G01N15/10, G01N15/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Title | German: | SPEKTRALE ZERLEGUNG VON FLUORESZENZBILDGEBUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON RADIOFREQUENZ-MULTIPLEX ANREGUNGSDATEN | [2021/34] | English: | SPECTRAL UNMIXING OF FLUORESCENCE IMAGING USING RADIOFREQUENCY-MULTIPLEXED EXCITATION DATA | [2021/34] | French: | SÉGRÉGATION SPECTRALE D'IMAGERIE PAR FLUORESCENCE À L'AIDE DE DONNÉES D'EXCITATION MULTIPLEXÉES PAR RADIOFRÉQUENCE | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 21.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2012129213 (HOYT CLIFFORD C [US]) | International search | [A]WO9715229 (CYTOMETRICS INC [US], et al)[A] 1-5,70-74; | [A]US2008051665 (XU HENG [US], et al) [A] 1-5,70-74; | [A]EP1573641 (ARRYX INC [US]) [A] 1-5,70-74; | [A]WO2015066552 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1-5,70-74; | [A]US2017268981 (DIEBOLD ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-5,70-74; | [A]US2017328826 (DIEBOLD ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-5,70-74 | by applicant | US8990 | US3380584 | US3960449 | US4347935 | US4667830 | US4704891 | US4770992 | US5030002 | US5040890 | US5047321 | US5245318 | US5317162 | US5464581 | US5483469 | US5602039 | US5620842 | US5627040 | US5643796 | US5700692 | US6295168 | US6372506 | US6809804 | US6813017 | US6821740 | US7129505 | US7201875 | US7400457 | US7417734 | US7544326 | US8140300 | US8233146 | US8753573 | US8975595 | US8990047 | US9034259 | US9092034 | US9095494 | US9097640 |