EP4029053 - ELECTROSTATIC PUCK AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Watlow Electric Manufacturing Company 12001 Lackland Road St. Louis, MO 63146 / US | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARGAVIO, Patrick 32 Broadway Village Dr Apt. G Columbia, MO 65201 / US | 02 /
ENGLISH, Kurt 3800 Saddlebrook Place, 2 Columbia, MO 65202 / US | 03 /
PTASIENSKI, Kevin 220 Irish Hound Dr. O'fallon, MO 63368 / US | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 20780451.9 | 09.09.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020US50009 | Priority number, date | US201916565054 | 09.09.2019 Original published format: US201916565054 | [2022/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021050602 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029053 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/683, H05B3/28 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
H01L21/6833 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L21/6831 (EP,CN);
H05B3/283 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | ELEKTROSTATISCHER PUCK UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/29] | English: | ELECTROSTATIC PUCK AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE | [2022/29] | French: | PUCK ÉLECTROSTATIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 22.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2009002913 (NAIM MAHMOOD [US]); | [A]US2014097539 (ZHANG JOHN H [US], et al); | [XAYI]US2019159294 (PTASIENSKI KEVIN [US], et al) |