EP4018492 - METHOD FOR ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVELY CONTACTING AN OPTOELECTRONIC COMPONENT HAVING AT LEAST ONE PROTECTIVE LAYER AND OPTOELECTRONIC COMPONENT HAVING A CONTACTING OF THIS TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heliatek GmbH Treidlerstraße 3 01139 Dresden / DE | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERITT, Michael Heliatek GmbH Treidlerstr. 3 01139 Dresden / DE | 02 /
KIRCHHOF, Christian Heliatek GmbH Treidlerstr. 3 01139 Dresden / DE | 03 /
MÜLLER, Susanne Heliatek GmbH Treidlerstr. 3 01139 Dresden / DE | 04 /
PANICKE, Ingrid Heliatek GmbH Treidlerstr. 3 01139 Dresden / DE | 05 /
WISINGER, Christian Heliatek GmbH Treidlerstr. 3 01139 Dresden / DE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20780556.5 | 18.08.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020DE100720 | Priority number, date | DE201910122213 | 19.08.2019 Original published format: DE102019122213 | [2022/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021032250 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4018492 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/44, H01L31/02 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
H01L31/02008 (EP,CN,KR);
H01L31/18 (CN);
H10K30/81 (US);
H01L31/02013 (EP,CN,KR);
H01L31/206 (KR);
H10K30/80 (EP,CN,KR);
H10K30/88 (US);
H10K77/111 (US);
Y02E10/50 (EP);
Y02E10/549 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTRISCH LEITENDEN KONTAKTIERUNG EINES MINDESTENS EINE SCHUTZSCHICHT AUFWEISENDEN OPTOELEKTRONISCHEN BAUELEMENTS UND OPTOELEKTRONISCHES BAUELEMENT MIT EINER SOLCHEN KONTAKTIERUNG | [2022/26] | English: | METHOD FOR ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVELY CONTACTING AN OPTOELECTRONIC COMPONENT HAVING AT LEAST ONE PROTECTIVE LAYER AND OPTOELECTRONIC COMPONENT HAVING A CONTACTING OF THIS TYPE | [2022/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN CONTACT ÉLECTROCONDUCTRICE D'UN COMPOSANT OPTOÉLECTRONIQUE COMPORTANT AU MOINS UNE COUCHE DE PROTECTION ET COMPOSANT OPTOÉLECTRONIQUE MUNI D'UN TELLE MISE EN CONTACT | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 10.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |