EP4007958 - IMAGING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2022/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIKUCHI, Seigo c/o Sony Imaging Products & Solutions Inc., 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2022/23] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/23] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20781114.2 | 10.09.2020 | [2022/23] | WO2020JP34265 | Priority number, date | JP20190179412 | 30.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019179412 | [2022/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021065406 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4007958 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/50, G06F16/11 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
G06F16/50 (EP);
H04N23/66 (US);
G06F16/113 (EP);
H04N1/32122 (US);
H04N2101/00 (US);
H04N2201/325 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/23] | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2022/23] | English: | IMAGING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2022/23] | French: | APPAREIL D'IMAGERIE, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME | [2022/23] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/23] | 03.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2015189118 (OGATA TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] ** claim 1 * | by applicant | JP2017138777 |