EP3951826 - ARC-EXTINGUISHING UNIT STRUCTURE FOR DIRECT CURRENT AIR CIRCUIT BREAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. LS Tower 127, LS-ro, Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14119 / KR | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Il-Hyun 40, LS-ro 116beon-gil, Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14118 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
KIM, Il-Hyun Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14118 / KR | Representative(s) | K&L Gates LLP Karolinen Karree Karlstraße 12 80333 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20782115.8 | 11.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020KR03413 | Priority number, date | KR20190039919 | 05.04.2019 Original published format: KR 20190039919 | [2022/06] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020204388 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3951826 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01H73/18, H01H31/02, H01H9/36 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
H01H9/362 (EP);
H01H73/18 (KR);
H01H33/182 (US);
H01H31/02 (KR);
H01H33/53 (US);
H01H9/30 (EP);
H01H9/443 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | H01H73/18, H01H31/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | STRUKTUR EINER LICHTBOGENLÖSCHEINHEIT FÜR GLEICHSTROM-LEISTUNGSSCHALTER | [2022/06] | English: | ARC-EXTINGUISHING UNIT STRUCTURE FOR DIRECT CURRENT AIR CIRCUIT BREAKER | [2022/06] | French: | STRUCTURE D'UNITÉ D'EXTINCTION D'ARC POUR DISJONCTEUR À AIR À COURANT CONTINU | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2021 | Translation filed | 02.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 11.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011297649 (AN YOUNG GYU [KR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0041] - [0047] *; | [Y]EP2431989 (SECHERON SA [CH]) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0043] *; | [A]EP2804190 (LSIS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** paragraphs [0012] - [0014] - [0026] - [0035] - [0039] *; | [A]US2017162348 (ZHOU XIN [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] , [0036] - [0044] *; | [YD]KR20180048151 (LSIS CO LTD [KR]) [YD] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0046] - [0048] * | International search | [Y]KR20140012034 (FUJI ELEC FA COMPONENTS & SYS [JP]) [Y] 9-11, 13, 14 * See paragraphs [0033]-[0035] and figures 3-4. *; | [A]KR20140036960 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14* See claims 1-7 and figure 1. *; | [Y]JP2014183028 (HITACHI IND EQUIPMENT SYS) [Y] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0014]-[0015], [0020] and figures 2B, 3B. 4. *; | [A]JP2016033890 (KAWAMURA ELECTRIC INC) [A] 1-14 * See claim 1 and figure 3. *; | [Y]KR20180048151 (LSIS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0033] and figures 5-6. * |