EP3950371 - HEAT TRANSFER SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUI, Hiroto c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
MATSUI, Hiroto Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20782444.2 | 25.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP13380 | Priority number, date | JP20190072338 | 04.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019072338 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020203566 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950371 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/44 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
B41M5/443 (EP,KR,US);
B41M2205/02 (EP,US);
B41M2205/06 (EP);
B41M2205/36 (EP,US);
B41M2205/38 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | B41M5/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNGSFOLIE | [2022/06] | English: | HEAT TRANSFER SHEET | [2022/06] | French: | FEUILLE DE TRANSFERT DE CHALEUR | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2021 | Translation filed | 30.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 27.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L]WO2020067278 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [X]JPH01218887 (RICOH KK); | [X]JP2000103178 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [X]JP2000272254 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [X]JP2000326641 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [X]JP2007098696 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [XA]JP2013082210 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [X]JP2017052141 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2009173024 |