EP3947409 - BIOSYNTHETIC PRODUCTION OF UDP-RHAMNOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conagen Inc. 15 DeAngelo Drive Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAO, Guohong 25 Forbes Avenue Burlington, MA 01803 / US | 02 /
HUNT, Phillip, James 942 Ames Hill Drive Tewksburry, MA 01876 / US | 03 /
BATTEN, Michael, James 86 Main Street Westford, MA 01886 / US | 04 /
HANLEY, Timothy, Joseph 1019 Avalon Drive Acton, MA 01720 / US | 05 /
YU, Oliver 39 Drummer Boy Way Lexington, MA 02420 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
MAO, Guohong Burlington, MA 01803 / US | ||
02 /
HUNT, Phillip, James Tewksburry, MA 01876 / US | |||
03 /
BATTEN, Michael, James Westford, MA 01886 / US | |||
04 /
HANLEY, Timothy, Joseph Acton, MA 01720 / US | |||
05 /
YU, Oliver Lexington, MA 02420 / US | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20782760.1 | 29.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US25610 | Priority number, date | US201962825799P | 29.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962825799 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020205685 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3947409 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/04, C12N15/00, C12N5/04, C12P19/00, C12P19/30 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
C12P19/56 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/52 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/70 (KR);
C12N15/74 (KR);
C12N15/81 (KR);
C12N9/0006 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/88 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/90 (EP,KR,US);
C12P19/305 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | C07H21/04, C12N15/00, C12N5/04, C12P19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | BIOSYNTHETISCHE HERSTELLUNG VON UDP-RHAMNOSE | [2022/06] | English: | BIOSYNTHETIC PRODUCTION OF UDP-RHAMNOSE | [2022/06] | French: | PRODUCTION BIOSYNTHÉTIQUE D'UDP-RHAMNOSE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 09.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102007023986 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,9,10 * [0004],[0006],[0031]-[0033],[0039]-[0052],[0071],[0079];; figure 1; sequences 8,20,22 *; | [A]WO2016120486 (EVOLVA SA [CH]) [A] 1-12,14,15; | [AP]WO2019178116 (CONAGEN INC [US])[AP] 1-12,14,15; | [ ] - Oka Takuji ET AL, "22: PN: DE102007023986 SEQID: 22 unclaimed protein", CAS, (20080103), Database accession no. 2008_6250_1000821748_1, XP093002267 [ ] * the whole document * | [ ] - Oka Takuji ET AL, "UDP-4-keto-6-deoxyglucose-3,5-epimerase (Arabidopsis thalian gene RHM2 C-terminal DE fragment) DE 8: PN: DE102007023986 SEQID: 8 claimed protein", CAS, (20080803), Database accession no. 2008_6250_1000821613_1, XP093002268 [ ] * the whole document * | [ ] - Oka Takuji ET AL, "UDP-4-keto rhamnose 4-keto reductase (Arabidopsis thalian gene RHM3), DE102007023986 SEQ ID: 20 claimed protein", CAS, (20080103), Database accession no. 2008_6250_1000821624_1, XP093002266 [ ] * the whole document * | [I] - PEI JIANJUN ET AL, "Construction of a novel UDP-rhamnose regeneration system by a two-enzyme reaction system and application in glycosylation of flavonoid", BIOCHEMICAL ENGINEERING JOURNAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20180811), vol. 139, doi:10.1016/J.BEJ.2018.08.007, ISSN 1369-703X, pages 33 - 42, XP085499108 [I] 1-12 * item 2.4; page 34, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1; figures 1,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bej.2018.08.007 | International search | [XY]US2008064069 (OKA TAKUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1, 2 * para [0039], [0051], Figure 1 * [Y] 18; | [Y]US2019085038 (BROG YAACOV MICHA [IL], et al) [Y] 18* para [0066], SEQ ID NO: 24042 * |