EP3951195 - ROLLING BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/06] | ROLLER BEARING | ||
[2024/14] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA Tomoya c/o NTN Corporation, 2454, Aza Tsuchijima, Oaza Higashikata Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-8678 / JP | [2024/35] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
NAKAMURA Tomoya Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-8678 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20782806.2 | 19.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP12369 | Priority number, date | JP20190070552 | 02.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019070552 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020203361 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3951195 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3951195 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/06, F16C33/44, F16C33/66, F04D29/046, F04D29/049, F16C33/38 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
F16C33/6696 (EP,US);
F16C19/16 (US);
F04D1/00 (EP);
F04D13/043 (EP);
F04D29/049 (EP);
F16C19/06 (EP);
F16C33/38 (US);
F16C33/3831 (EP,US);
F16C33/44 (EP);
F05D2300/10 (EP);
F05D2300/44 (EP);
F16C2208/32 (EP);
F16C2220/24 (EP);
F16C2300/52 (EP);
F16C2360/24 (EP);
F16C2360/45 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | F16C19/06, F16C33/44, F16C33/66, F04D29/046, F04D29/049 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄLZLAGER | [2022/06] | English: | ROLLING BEARING | [2024/14] | French: | ROULEMENT | [2024/14] |
Former [2022/06] | ROLLER BEARING | ||
Former [2022/06] | ROULEMENT À ROULEAUX | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2021 | Translation filed | 21.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 18.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10110915 (INA SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]); | [X]JP2003049841 (NSK LTD); | [X]JP2012255521 (NSK LTD) | International search | [XA]WO2007058351 (NSK LTD [JP], et al); | [XYA]JP2009174631 (JTEKT CORP); | [YA]JP2013047553 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD); | [YA]JP2015232382 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD); | [A]DE102018115766 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) | Examination | DE102018115766 | by applicant | JPH0220854B | JP6178117B |