EP3952437 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
Former [2022/06] | For all designated states TENCENT TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) COMPANY LIMITED 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Tao 35/F, Tencent Building, Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
WANG, Tao Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20783725.3 | 25.02.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020CN76623 | Priority number, date | CN201910261362 | 02.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910261362 | [2022/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020199792 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3952437 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/24, H04L41/5009, H04L43/0852, // H04W28/02 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
H04W28/24 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L41/5009 (EP);
H04L43/0858 (EP);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W72/543 (CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/22] | H04W28/24, // H04W28/08 | ||
Former IPC [2022/06] | H04W28/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/06] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2022/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION, SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2021 | Translation filed | 02.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 16.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2011050540 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1,9,13-15 * the whole document * [A] 4,5 [I] 2,3,6-8,10-12; | [A]EP3110210 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2018233451 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]CN102111819 (UNIV TSINGHUA) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [A]CN102638852 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [A]WO2018130741 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [A]WO2018145103 (IDAC HOLDINGS INC [US]) [A] 1-18* entire document *; | [A]CN109245936 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * description, paragraphs [0053]-[0240] *; | [PX]CN110062426 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [PX] 1-18 * claims 1-17, and description, paragraph [0159] * |