EP3950341 - TRANSFER SHEET AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING DECORATIVE MOLDED PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1-1 Ichigaya Kagacho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NODA, Akihisa c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD., 1-1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 02 /
OOTA, Naoki c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD., 1-1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 03 /
SAKONAKA, Kazuyuki c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD., 1-1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 04 /
NAKATSUGAWA, Yuji c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD., 1-1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
NODA, Akihisa Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | ||
02 /
OOTA, Naoki Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | |||
03 /
SAKONAKA, Kazuyuki Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | |||
04 /
NAKATSUGAWA, Yuji Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20783737.8 | 26.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP13709 | Priority number, date | JP20190069062 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019069062 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020203659 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950341 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B44C1/17, B32B27/20, B32B7/06, B29C45/14, B44F1/02 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
B44C1/1712 (EP);
B44F1/02 (EP);
B29C45/14811 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | B32B27/20, B44C1/17, B32B7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | TRANSFERFOLIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DEKORATIVEN FORMPRODUKTS | [2022/06] | English: | TRANSFER SHEET AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING DECORATIVE MOLDED PRODUCT | [2022/06] | French: | FEUILLE DE TRANSFERT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PRODUIT MOULÉ DÉCORATIF | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2021 | Translation filed | 22.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 11.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH044926B (TOPPAN PRINTING CO., LTD.) [Y] 1-7 * examples 1-2 * * figures 1-3 * * page 30, column 3, line 22 - line 31 *; | [A]JP2012183808 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2015077713 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2015098095 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1-7 * example 1 * * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0032] - [0033] *; | [A]JP2016064636 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]WO2016133101 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2016190332 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1-7 * examples 1-4 * * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0076] *; | [Y]JP2016190333 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1-7 * examples 1-3 * * comparative example 1 * * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0073] *; | [Y]JP2018144235 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1-7 * examples 1,3-4 * * comparative example 1 * * figures 3-4 * * paragraph [0054] * | International search | [Y]JPH044926B [Y] 1-5; | [A]JP2012183808 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-5; | [A]JP2015077713 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-5; | [Y]JP2015098095 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1-5; | [A]JP2016064636 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD)[A] 1-5; | [A]WO2016133101 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [A] 1-5; | [Y]JP2016190332 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1-5; | [Y]JP2016190333 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1-5; | [Y]JP2018144235 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 | by applicant | JP5891590B |