EP3950160 - MULTISTAGE ROLLING MILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sendzimir Japan, Ltd. 1-17-25, Shinkawa Chuo-ku Tokyo, 104-0033 / JP | [2023/52] |
Former [2022/06] | For all designated states Sendzimir Japan, Ltd. 2-10-14, Higashi-Kanda, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 101-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORIKURA, Takashi c/o SENDZIMIR JAPAN, LTD. 2-10-14, Higashi-Kanda, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0031 / JP | [2022/28] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
NORIKURA, Takashi Tokyo 101-0031 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20784114.9 | 01.04.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP15023 | Priority number, date | JP20190072179 | 04.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019072179 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020204070 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950160 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3950160 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B21B13/14, B21B1/00, B21B31/18, B21B37/38 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
B21B31/18 (EP,US);
B21B13/14 (US);
B21B13/142 (EP);
B21B13/145 (EP);
B21B37/38 (US);
B21B13/16 (EP);
B21B2027/103 (EP);
B21B2267/06 (EP);
B21B2269/12 (EP);
B21B31/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRSTUFIGES WALZWERK | [2022/06] | English: | MULTISTAGE ROLLING MILL | [2022/06] | French: | LAMINOIR À PLUSIEURS ÉTAGES | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2021 | Translation filed | 19.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 12.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2023 | CZ | 27.12.2023 | EE | 27.12.2023 | ES | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | IT | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | NL | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | PT | 29.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 27.12.2023 | |
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1721685 (SENDZIMIR INC T [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-2; claims 1-10 *; | [A]WO2012008030 (MITSUBISHI HITACHI METALS [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-4,7b,8-13; claims 1-6 *; | [A]JP2013123742 (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP3130408 (PRIMETALS TECH JAPAN LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-5,6A,6B; claims 1-10 * | International search | [YA]JPS62144803 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [Y] 9 [A] 1-8, 10-12; | [A]JP2001232402 (HITACHI LTD)[A] 1-12; | [YA]JP2006505413 [Y] 9 [A] 1-8, 10-12; | [YA]JP2006315084 (SENDZIMIR INC T) [Y] 8 [A] 1-7, 9-12; | [XYA]WO2012008030 (MITSUBISHI HITACHI METALS [JP], et al) [X] 7, 10-12 [Y] 8-9 [A] 1-6; | [A]JP2013123742 (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1-12 | by applicant | JP2006315084 |