EP3951929 - POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY, POSITIVE ELECTRODE SHEET FOR LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Envision AESC Japan Ltd. 10-1, Hironodai 2-chome Zama-shi, Kanagawa 252-0012 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Moeko c/o Envision AESC Energy Devices Ltd., 1120, Shimokuzawa, Chuo-ku Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-0254 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Takeshi c/o Envision AESC Energy Devices Ltd., 1120, Shimokuzawa, Chuo-ku Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-0254 / JP | 03 /
SHIRAISHI, Shoichiro c/o Envision AESC Energy Devices Ltd., 1120, Shimokuzawa, Chuo-ku Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-0254 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
SATO, Moeko Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-0254 / JP | ||
02 /
SAITO, Takeshi Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-0254 / JP | |||
03 /
SHIRAISHI, Shoichiro Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-0254 / JP | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20784194.1 | 26.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP13702 | Priority number, date | JP20190067770 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019067770 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020203658 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3951929 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/04, H01M4/13, H01M4/139, H01M4/62, H01M4/66, H01M50/431, H01M50/443, H01M50/446, // H01M4/02 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
H01M4/62 (EP,US);
H01M4/0404 (EP);
H01M4/13 (EP);
H01M4/139 (EP);
H01M4/366 (US);
H01M4/621 (EP);
H01M4/667 (EP);
H01M50/431 (EP);
H01M50/443 (EP);
H01M50/446 (EP);
H01M2004/021 (US);
H01M2004/028 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | H01M4/13, H01M4/139, H01M4/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | POSITIVELEKTRODE FÜR LITHIUM-IONEN-AKKUMULATOR, POSITIVELEKTRODENBLECH FÜR LITHIUM-IONEN-AKKUMULATOR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/06] | English: | POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY, POSITIVE ELECTRODE SHEET FOR LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2022/06] | French: | ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM-ION, FEUILLE D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM-ION ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIÉ | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2021 | Translation filed | 01.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 10.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009246612 (NAOI KATSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]EP2450989 (GS YUASA INT LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * page 2, paragraph 0012 - page 13, paragraph 0087; figures 1-6; table 1 *; | [X]WO2016157770 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12 * page 2, paragraph 0006 - page 5, paragraph 0016 *; | [XD]JP2016186945 (AUTOMOTIVE ENERGY SUPPLY CORP) [XD] 1-12 * page 1, paragraph 0007 - page 8, paragraph 0053; figures 1-12 * | International search | [XY]JP2004259625 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 9, 11-12 [Y] 1-8, 10, 12; | [X]JP2012114079 (GS YUASA CORP) [X] 1-8, 10, 12; | [Y]WO2012128160 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8, 10, 12; | [Y]WO2014162437 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP])[Y] 6; | [XY]JP2017157471 (GS YUASA CORP) [X] 8, 10, 12 [Y] 1-8, 10, 12 | by applicant | JPH1074535 | JP2003151535 | JP2004259625 | JP2006147392 | JP2007095656 | JP2009238487 | JP2011081920 | JP2012074359 | JP2012114079 | JP2012178326 | WO2012128160 | JP2016186945 | JP2019067770 | JP20120204334 |