EP3946387 - HYPOXIA-INDUCING CRYOGELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northeastern University Center for Research Innovation 900 RP 360 Huntington Avenue Boston, MA 02115 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENCHERIF, Sidi A. 54 Princeton Street, Unit 2 Boston, MA 02128 / US | 02 /
COLOMBANI, Thibault 409 Dudley Street, Unit 9 Boston, MA 02119 / US | 03 /
ROGERS, Zachary 169 Winchester Street, Apt. 1 Brookline, MA 02446 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
BENCHERIF, Sidi A. Boston, MA 02128 / US | ||
02 /
COLOMBANI, Thibault Boston, MA 02119 / US | |||
03 /
ROGERS, Zachary Brookline, MA 02446 / US | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20784388.9 | 02.04.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US26310 | Priority number, date | US201962828110P | 02.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962828110 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020206065 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3946387 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/28, A61K9/00 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A61K38/39 (EP);
A61K47/6903 (EP,US);
A61K38/08 (EP,US);
A61K38/19 (EP);
A61K38/195 (EP);
A61K38/443 (EP);
A61K47/58 (EP,US);
C12Y101/03004 (EP);
C12Y101/03009 (EP);
C12Y101/0301 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | HYPOXIEINDUZIERENDE KRYOGENE | [2022/06] | English: | HYPOXIA-INDUCING CRYOGELS | [2022/06] | French: | CRYOGELS INDUISANT L'HYPOXIE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 04.06.2022 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 29.06.2022 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/13] | 23.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2015196584 (GERECHT SHARON [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * ; Abstract *; | [A]WO2018017657 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2018216063 (GERECHT SHARON [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * ; entire document *; | [PA]WO2020033713 (UNIV NORTHEASTERN [US]) [P] 1-3 * ; entire document *[A] ; | [Y] - LEEPER, "Northeastern Undergraduate Engineering And Applied Sciences Review", Embark, (20180819), pages 1 - 34, URL: https://issuu.com/northeastern/docs/embark_volume_2, (20200613), XP055861769 [Y] 1-3 * ; p3 * |