EP3948592 - DIGITAL RIGHTS MANAGEMENT AUTHORIZATION TOKEN PAIRING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARRIS Enterprises LLC 3871 Lakefield Drive Suwanee Georgia 30024 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALLAGHER, Karl M. 56 Lisaghmore Avenue Londonderry BT47 2JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
GALLAGHER, Karl M. Londonderry BT47 2JJ / GB | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20785168.4 | 01.04.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US26239 | Priority number, date | US201962828737P | 03.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962828737 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020206014 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3948592 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00, G06F21/10, H04L9/40, H04N21/258, H04N21/6334, H04N21/8352, H04N21/8355 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
H04N21/8355 (EP);
G06F21/105 (EP,US);
G06F21/1011 (EP);
H04L63/0428 (EP);
H04L63/0884 (EP);
H04L63/10 (EP);
H04L63/126 (EP);
H04L9/3213 (US);
H04L9/3263 (US);
H04N21/25816 (EP);
H04N21/63345 (EP);
H04N21/835 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | G06F21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | PAARUNG VON AUTORISIERUNGSTOKEN ZUR VERWALTUNG VON DIGITALEN RECHTEN | [2022/06] | English: | DIGITAL RIGHTS MANAGEMENT AUTHORIZATION TOKEN PAIRING | [2022/06] | French: | APPARIEMENT DE JETON D'AUTORISATION DE GESTION DE DROITS NUMÉRIQUES | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 23.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/48] | 12.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013152221 (YIN FENGLIN [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0096] * * figures 5-11 *; | [A]US2013167253 (SELEZNEV SERGEY NIKOLAYEVICH [KR], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0071] * * figure 4 *; | [A]US2014047566 (KIDRON ADAM [US]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0174] - paragraph [0230] ** figures 24A-24c * | International search | [A]US2010185869 (MOORE TIMOTHY WALTER [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [X]US2014047566 (KIDRON ADAM [US]) [X] 1-20 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1a, 1b, 7a, 7c, 24a, 24b, 24c; para [0044], [0058], [0080], [0094], [0103], [0174] - [0176], [0214], [0230] *; | [A]US2016077901 (ROTH ISSAC JACOB [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2016077902 (FENG ZHAOHUI [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2017192803 (MARTORI RITCHIE TYLER [US], et al) [A] 1-20* , entire document * |