EP3951982 - BINDER FOR SOLID-STATE SECONDARY BATTERY, BINDER COMPOSITION FOR SOLID-STATE SECONDARY BATTERY, SLURRY FOR SOLID-STATE SECONDARY BATTERY, SOLID ELECTROLYTIC SHEET FOR SOLID-STATE SECONDARY BATTERY, AND PRODUCTION METHODS THEREFOR, AND SOLID-STATE SECONDARY BATTERY AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENEOS Materials Corporation 9-2, Higashi-Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0021 / JP | [2022/42] |
Former [2022/06] | For all designated states JSR Corporation 9-2, Higashi-Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASO, Keigo c/o JSR CORPORATION, 9-2, Higashi-shinbashi 1- chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | 02 /
OHASHI, Taira c/o JSR CORPORATION, 9-2, Higashi-shinbashi 1- chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | 03 /
AZECHI, Motohisa c/o JSR CORPORATION, 9-2, Higashi-shinbashi 1- chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | 04 /
SUKEGUCHI, Daisuke c/o JSR CORPORATION, 9-2, Higashi-shinbashi 1- chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | 05 /
ITAI, Shingo c/o JSR CORPORATION, 9-2, Higashi-shinbashi 1- chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
ASO, Keigo Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | ||
02 /
OHASHI, Taira Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | |||
03 /
AZECHI, Motohisa Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | |||
04 /
SUKEGUCHI, Daisuke Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | |||
05 /
ITAI, Shingo Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20785194.0 | 06.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP09664 | Priority number, date | JP20190066166 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019066166 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020203042 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3951982 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/62, H01M10/0562, C08F220/18, C08F220/34, C08F220/56, H01M4/139, H01M10/0585, H01M10/04 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
C08F220/1812 (EP,US);
H01M4/622 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/18 (EP,KR);
C08F220/1804 (US);
C08F220/1808 (US);
C08F220/34 (KR);
C08F220/56 (KR);
H01M10/04 (EP);
H01M10/0562 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0585 (EP,KR);
H01M4/139 (KR,US);
H01M2300/0068 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F220/1804, C08F220/1806, C08F220/1812, C08F220/34, C08F220/20 (EP);
C08F220/1812, C08F220/1804, C08F220/54, C08F220/20 (EP) |
Former IPC [2022/06] | H01M10/0562, C08F220/18, C08F220/34, C08F220/56, H01M4/139, H01M4/62, H01M10/0585 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | BINDEMITTEL FÜR FESTKÖRPERSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, BINDEMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR FESTKÖRPERSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, AUFSCHLÄMMUNG FÜR FESTKÖRPERSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, FESTE ELEKTROLYTSCHICHT FÜR FESTKÖRPERSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE FESTKÖRPERSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/06] | English: | BINDER FOR SOLID-STATE SECONDARY BATTERY, BINDER COMPOSITION FOR SOLID-STATE SECONDARY BATTERY, SLURRY FOR SOLID-STATE SECONDARY BATTERY, SOLID ELECTROLYTIC SHEET FOR SOLID-STATE SECONDARY BATTERY, AND PRODUCTION METHODS THEREFOR, AND SOLID-STATE SECONDARY BATTERY AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR | [2022/06] | French: | LIANT POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, COMPOSITION DE LIANT POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, BOUILLIE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, FEUILLE ÉLECTROLYTIQUE SOLIDE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIÉS, ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2021 | Translation filed | 11.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 21.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]KR20190004562 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | International search | [A]WO2012073678 (JSR CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2012243476 (NIPPON ZEON CO); | [A]JP2015167126 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [A]WO2016136090 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) |