EP3945851 - THERMOCHROMIC TEMPERATURE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chromatic Technologies, Inc. 1096 Elkton Drive Suite 600 Colorado Springs, CO 80907 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMALL, Lyle, D. 13344 Clinet Drive Colorado Springs, CO 80921 / US | 02 /
OWEN, Timothy, J. 850 Calliope Court Colorado Springs, CO 80916 / US | 03 /
WANG, Ruizheng 8920 Chetwood Drive Colorado Springs, CO 80920 / US | 04 /
ABRAHA, Medhanei 2828 Dublin Boulevard Apt. 132 Colorado Springs CO 80918 / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
SMALL, Lyle, D. Colorado Springs, CO 80921 / US | ||
02 /
OWEN, Timothy, J. Colorado Springs, CO 80916 / US | |||
03 /
WANG, Ruizheng Colorado Springs, CO 80920 / US | |||
04 /
ABRAHA, Medhanei Colorado Springs CO 80918 / GB | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | Kador & Partner PartG mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20785251.8 | 01.04.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US26073 | Priority number, date | US201962827715P | 01.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962827715 P | US201962908986P | 01.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962908986 P | US202016835983 | 31.03.2020 Original published format: US202016835983 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020205910 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3945851 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A23L3/015, A23L5/40, G01L11/00, C09K9/02, C09D11/03, G01K11/16, C09D11/50, C09B67/44, C09D11/033, C09D11/037 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
C09D11/50 (EP,US);
G01K11/16 (EP,US);
C09B67/0083 (EP);
C09B9/00 (US);
C09D11/033 (EP);
C09D11/037 (EP,US);
C09K9/02 (EP);
G01K3/005 (US);
C09K2211/1007 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | A23L3/015, A23L5/40, G01L11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | THERMOCHROMER TEMPERATURSENSOR | [2022/06] | English: | THERMOCHROMIC TEMPERATURE SENSOR | [2022/06] | French: | CAPTEUR DE TEMPÉRATURE THERMOCHROMIQUE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 23.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0188635 (MATSUI SHIKISO KAGAKU KOGYOSHO [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH03197573 (KANZAKI PAPER MFG CO LTD); | [XY]US5527385 (SUMII MASAAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2018110200 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [X]EP3367079 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | International search | [A]US5281570 (HASEGAWA KIYOHARU [JP], et al); | [A]US5558699 (NAKASHIMA AKIO [JP], et al); | [XY]US2004229754 (FUJITA KATSUYUKI [JP]); | [Y]JP2006188660 (PILOT INK CO LTD); | [A]US2012141188 (FUJITA KATSUYUKI [JP]); |