EP4348434 - INVARIANT SIGNATURE GENERATION AND PATTERN DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cortica Ltd. Montefiore 39 st. 6520108 Tel Aviv / IL | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAICHELGAUZ, Igal 2 HaMaccabi St. 6329302 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
ODINAEV, Karina 2 HaMaccabi St. 6329302 Tel Aviv / IL | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Fragala, Riccardo Via Cavalese, 25 00135 Roma / IT | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 20785341.7 | 25.03.2020 | [2024/15] | WO2020IB52807 | Priority number, date | US201962827112P | 31.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962827112 P | [2024/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020201926 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4348434 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/00, G06F17/16, G06N3/04, H04L9/32 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
G06V10/255 (EP,US);
G06F18/211 (US);
G06F18/217 (US);
G06F18/22 (US);
G06F18/25 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06T3/40 (US);
G06T5/50 (US);
G06T7/246 (US);
G06T7/70 (US);
G06V10/25 (EP,US);
G06V10/422 (EP,US);
G06V20/40 (US);
G06V20/46 (US);
G06F18/2155 (US);
G06T2207/10016 (US);
G06T2207/20081 (US);
G06T2207/20221 (US);
G06V10/454 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG EINER INVARIANTEN SIGNATUR UND MUSTERERKENNUNG | [2024/15] | English: | INVARIANT SIGNATURE GENERATION AND PATTERN DETECTION | [2024/15] | French: | GÉNÉRATION DE SIGNATURES INVARIANTES ET DÉTECTION DE MOTIFS | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2021 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 24.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | Request for further processing for: | 22.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.03.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2022 | 31.03.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2023 | 31.03.2024 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010306736 (BORDELON ADAM L [US], et al); | [A]US8266150 (LIN YINGQIANG [US], et al); | [A]US2013138654 (SATHISH SAILESH KUMAR [FI], et al); | [A]US2013179691 (NAITO YUSUKE [JP], et al); | [A]US2018260416 (ELKAIM MICHAEL [GB], et al); |