EP4041467 - SHEET STEEL HAVING A DETERMINISTIC SURFACE STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH STEEL SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/33] | SHEET STEEL HAVING A DETERMINISTIC SURFACE STRUCTURE | ||
[2023/45] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOGT, Oliver Rübenkamp 59 44319 Dortmund / DE | 02 /
JUNGE, Fabian 46485 Wesel / DE | 03 /
CETINKAYA, Burak William Am Knappenberg 114 44139 Dortmund / DE | [2023/52] |
Former [2022/33] | 01 /
VOGT, Oliver Rübenkamp 59 44319 Dortmund / DE | ||
02 /
JUNGE, Fabian Ostendorfstraße 4 40239 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03 /
CETINKAYA, Burak William Am Knappenberg 114 44139 Dortmund / DE | Representative(s) | ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Patente/Patent Department Kaiser-Wilhelm-Straße 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20785704.6 | 28.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020EP77098 | Priority number, date | DE201910215580 | 10.10.2019 Original published format: DE102019215580 | [2022/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021069247 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4041467 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4041467 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B21B1/22 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
B21B1/227 (EP,CN);
B21B27/005 (CN);
B21B45/0251 (CN);
B21B2001/228 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STAHLBLECH MIT EINER DETERMINISTISCHEN OBERFLÄCHENSTRUKTUR SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2023/45] | English: | SHEET STEEL HAVING A DETERMINISTIC SURFACE STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH STEEL SHEET | [2023/45] | French: | TÔLE D'ACIER À STRUCTURE DE SURFACE DÉTERMINISTE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE TELLE TÔLE D'ACIER | [2023/45] |
Former [2022/33] | STAHLBLECH MIT EINER DETERMINISTISCHEN OBERFLÄCHENSTRUKTUR | ||
Former [2022/33] | SHEET STEEL HAVING A DETERMINISTIC SURFACE STRUCTURE | ||
Former [2022/33] | TÔLE D'ACIER À STRUCTURE DE SURFACE DÉTERMINISTE | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 11.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | HR | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 21.05.2024 | |
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]JPH0475704 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]EP1136574 (EIDGENOESS MUNITIONSFAB THUN [CH]); | [A]WO03004186 (BLANCO GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al); | [YD]EP2892663 (DAETWYLER GRAPHICS AG [CH], et al) | by applicant | EP2892663 |