EP4041005 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SHAPING A CONTINUOUS WEB MATERIAL INTO A ROD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): EE | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2023/48] |
Former [2022/33] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products, S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANTIERI, Fabio Via Piemonte 15 40069 Zola Predosa Bologna / IT | 02 /
GIANNINI, Antonella Via Armando Sarti 6 40132 Bologna / IT | 03 /
LA PORTA, Pietro Davide 40133 Bologna / IT | 04 /
MALOSSI, Stefano Via Armando Sarti 6 40132 Bologna / IT | 05 /
MONZONI, Alberto Via Armando Sarti 6 40132 Bologna / IT | 06 /
PRESTIA, Ivan Via Piemonte 15 40069 Zola Predosa, Bologna / IT | 07 /
CASTALDO, Cristian Via Piemonte 15 40069 Zola Predosa, Bologna / IT | 08 /
PALADINO, Genny Via Piemonte 15 40069 Zola Predosa, Bologna / IT | [2023/40] |
Former [2022/33] | 01 /
CANTIERI, Fabio Via Piemonte 15 40069 Zola Predosa Bologna / IT | ||
02 /
GIANNINI, Antonella Via Armando Sarti 6 40132 Bologna / IT | |||
03 /
LA PORTA, Pietro, Davide Via Piemonte 15 40069 Zola Predosa Bologna / IT | |||
04 /
MALOSSI, Stefano Via Armando Sarti 6 40132 Bologna / IT | |||
05 /
MONZONI, Alberto Via Armando Sarti 6 40132 Bologna / IT | |||
06 /
PRESTIA, Ivan Via Piemonte 15 40069 Zola Predosa, Bologna / IT | |||
07 /
CASTALDO, Cristian Via Piemonte 15 40069 Zola Predosa, Bologna / IT | |||
08 /
PALADINO, Genny Via Piemonte 15 40069 Zola Predosa, Bologna / IT | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/33] | Bohest AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 20786303.6 | 08.10.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020EP78194 | Priority number, date | EP20190202138 | 09.10.2019 Original published format: EP 19202138 | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021069534 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4041005 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4041005 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/01, A24D3/17, A24D3/02 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
A24C5/01 (EP,KR,US);
A24C5/18 (KR);
A24C5/1864 (US);
A24B15/167 (US);
A24C5/1807 (US);
A24C5/24 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FORMEN EINES KONTINUIERLICHEN BAHNMATERIALS ZU EINEM STRANG | [2023/27] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SHAPING A CONTINUOUS WEB MATERIAL INTO A ROD | [2022/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE FAÇONNAGE D'UN MATÉRIAU EN BANDE CONTINUE DANS UNE TIGE | [2023/27] |
Former [2022/33] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FORMEN EINES KONTINUIERLICHEN BAHNMATERIALS ZU EINER STANGE | ||
Former [2022/33] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE MISE EN FORME D'UN MATÉRIAU EN BANDE CONTINUE EN UNE TIGE | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 25.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP3232828 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0016] , [0 53] , [0 55] , [0 61] - [0064]; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]EP3328221 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [A] 1,11* paragraph [0008] *; | [A]WO2018210982 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [A] 1,11 * page 1, lines 21-30; figures 1, 2 * * page 8, lines 9-12 * * page 9, lines 10-14 *; | [A]WO2019158313 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [A] 1,11 * page 9, line 32 - page 10, line 12; figure 1 * |