EP4038707 - LASER PACKAGE AND SYSTEM WITH LASER PACKAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM Opto Semiconductors GmbH Leibnizstraße 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | [2024/26] |
Former [2022/32] | For all designated states OSRAM Opto Semiconductors GmbH Leibnizstraße 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Lumus Ltd. 8 Pinchas Sapir Street 7403631 Ness Ziona / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSSELL, Ann 88 South 3rd Street, PMB 129 San Jose, California 95113 / US | 02 /
DANZIGER, Yochay 2 Rotem St. 25147 Kfar Vradim / IL | 03 /
SORG, Jörg Erich Gozratstr. 12 93053 Regensburg / DE | 04 /
HALBRITTER, Hubert Am Arzberg 3 92345 Dietfurt / DE | 05 /
LENEF, Alan 76 Albert Avenue Belmont, Massachusetts 02478 / US | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 20786494.3 | 30.09.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020EP77314 | Priority number, date | US201962907799P | 30.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962907799 P | US201962927372P | 29.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962927372 P | US201962930762P | 05.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962930762 P | US201962943860P | 05.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962943860 P | US202062969622P | 03.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062969622 P | US202062982151P | 27.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062982151 P | US202063038058P | 11.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063038058 P | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021063994 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4038707 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/022, H01S5/40, H01S5/0222, H01S5/02255, H01S5/023, H01S5/0235, H01S5/0233, H01S3/10, H01S5/00, H01S5/024, H01S5/0683 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
H01S5/4031 (EP,IL,KR);
H01S5/02255 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H01S3/10061 (EP,IL,KR);
H01S5/0071 (EP,IL,KR);
H01S5/0222 (EP,IL,KR);
H01S5/0225 (EP,IL,KR);
H01S5/02253 (EP,IL,KR);
H01S5/02257 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H01S5/023 (EP,IL,US);
H01S5/02325 (EP,IL,KR);
H01S5/0233 (EP,IL,KR);
H01S5/02335 (US);
H01S5/0234 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H01S5/02345 (EP,IL,KR);
H01S5/0235 (EP,IL,KR);
H01S5/0237 (EP,IL,KR);
H01S5/02469 (EP,IL,KR);
H01S5/0683 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Title | German: | LASERPAKET UND SYSTEM MIT LASERPAKETEN | [2022/32] | English: | LASER PACKAGE AND SYSTEM WITH LASER PACKAGES | [2022/32] | French: | BOÎTIER LASER ET SYSTÈME COMPRENANT DES BOÎTIERS LASER | [2022/32] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 25.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US5608742 (PETERSEN ALAN B [US]) [X] 17 * column 5, line 6 - column 6, line 35; figures 1-8 * * column 7, line 27 - line 35; figure 13 * [Y] 9 [I] 18; | [XYI]US2002176153 (MATSUSHITA SHUNICHI [JP], et al) [X] 19 * paragraph [0045]; figures 3A-3C * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1A, 1B * * paragraph [0056]; figure 9A * [Y] 9[I] 20; | [XYI]US2004165254 (TOKURA TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 19 * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0105]; figure 16 * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0078]; figure 10 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 9 [I] 20; | [IY]US2008019010 (GOVORKOV SERGEI V [US], et al) [I] 1,10 * figures 4a, 4B, 4C, 5 * [Y] 6-9,11,12,16; | [Y]US2012039072 (LELL ALFRED [DE], et al) [Y] 6,7 * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0116]; figure 27 *; | [XYI]US2018097335 (BREIDENASSEL ANDREAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,13-15 * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0150]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 6-9,11,12,16 [I] 5; | [Y]US2019121137 (DYKAAR DOUGLAS R [CA]) [Y] 16 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0057]; figure 1A *; | [IY]WO2019149352 (TRUMPF LASER GMBH [DE]) [I] 1 * page 15 - page 16; figures 4A,4B * [Y] 6-9,11,12,16; | [Y]DE102018102961 (MSG LITHOGLAS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076]; figures 12,13 * | by applicant | US19990629077 | US19510629821 | US19580630380 | US19720629273 | US19620629307 | US19600629438 | US20220629696 |