EP4048450 - SCREENING CYLINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LT | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Straße 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUTTERER, Jürgen Kessler 2 88263 Horgenzell / DE | 02 /
GOTTSCHALK, Gert Marktstr. 51 88212 Ravensburg / DE | 03 /
MASALA, Roberto Kirchbergstr. 42 89564 Nattheim / DE | 04 /
WIESE, Klaus-Herbert Im Wiesengrund 6 89522 Heidenheim / DE | 05 /
ZAVORNIK, Oliver Schubartstrasse 2 89537 Giengen / DE | 06 /
ZAVORNIK, Ivica Schubartstrasse 2 89537 Giengen / DE | [2023/21] |
Former [2023/20] | 01 /
FUTTERER, Jürgen Kessler 2 88263 Horgenzell / DE | ||
02 /
GOTTSCHALK, Gert Marktstr. 51 88212 Ravensburg / DE | |||
03 /
MASALA, Roberto Kirchbergstr. 42 89564 Nattheim / DE | |||
04 /
WIESE, Klaus-Herbert Im Wiesengrund 6 89522 Heidenheim / DE | |||
05 /
ZAVORNIK, Oliver Schubartstrasse 2 89537 Giengen / DE | |||
06 /
ZAVORNIK, Ivika Schubartstrasse 2 89537 Giengen / DE | |||
Former [2022/35] | 01 /
FUTTERER, Jürgen Kessler 2 88263 Horgenzell / DE | ||
02 /
GOTTSCHALK, Gert Marktstr. 51 88212 Ravensburg / DE | |||
03 /
MASALA, Roberto Kirchbergstr. 42 89564 Nattheim / DE | |||
04 /
WIESE, Klaus-Herbert Im Wiesengrund 6 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 20786508.0 | 01.10.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020EP77554 | Priority number, date | DE201910128878 | 25.10.2019 Original published format: DE102019128878 | [2022/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021078490 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4048450 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4048450 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B07B1/12, B07B1/18, B07B1/46 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
B07B1/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B07B1/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B07B1/4618 (EP,CN,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | B07B1/18, B07B1/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] |
Former [2022/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIEBZYLINDER | [2022/35] | English: | SCREENING CYLINDER | [2022/35] | French: | CYLINDRE DE CRIBLAGE | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 25.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 13.12.2023 | BG | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4846971 (LAMORT PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - line 9 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 39 * * column 5, line 40 - line 47 * * claim - * * figure - *; | [XI]US5968357 (DOELLE KLAUS [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 15 * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 33 * * column 4, line 11 - line 21 * * claim - * * figure - *[I] 5; | [XI]US2011005981 (HETU MARC-ANDRE [CA]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0108] * * claim - * * figure - * [I] 9 | by applicant | DE102006007660 | EP3143198 |