EP3937394 - METHOD FOR SCREENING CYCLIC SHIFT DIVERSITY SEQUENCES AND RELATED APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIA, Kaifeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
GAN, Ming Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZUO, Xin Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Xun Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
XIA, Kaifeng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
GAN, Ming Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
03 /
ZUO, Xin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
04 /
YANG, Xun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20787186.4 | 10.04.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020CN84151 | Priority number, date | CN201910290009 | 11.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910290009 | [2022/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020207460 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3937394 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04B7/08 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
H04B7/0671 (EP);
H04B7/0667 (CN,KR,US);
H04B7/0684 (CN,KR,US);
H04B7/0426 (KR);
H04B7/0894 (EP);
H04W72/0453 (KR);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/02] | H04B7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCREENING VON CYCLIC-SHIFT-DIVERSITY-SEQUENZEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/02] | English: | METHOD FOR SCREENING CYCLIC SHIFT DIVERSITY SEQUENCES AND RELATED APPARATUS | [2022/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉLECTION DE SÉQUENCES DE DIVERSITÉ DE DÉCALAGE CYCLIQUE ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2021 | Translation filed | 06.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 04.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011305194 (ZHENG JUN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,12-14 * paragraph [0128] - paragraph [0230] * * figures 12-28 * [I] 4-11; | [XI]US2017201944 (LIN WEI [CN], et al) [X] 1-3,12-14 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0408] - paragraph [0414] * * figures 1-5,24 * [I] 4-11; | [XI] - RUI CAO (MARVELL), "Discussion on WUR Multi-Antenna Transmission", vol. 802.11ba, (20180305), pages 1 - 24, IEEE DRAFT; 11-18-0413-00-00BA-DISCUSSION-ON-WUR-MULTI-ANTENNA-TRANSMISSION, IEEE-SA MENTOR, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, URL: https://mentor.ieee.org/802.11/dcn/18/11-18-0413-00-00ba-discussion-on-wur-multi-antenna-transmission.pptx, (20180305), XP068125361 [X] 1-3,12-14 * the whole document * [I] 4-11 | International search | [A]CN102377468 (BROADCOM CORP) [A] 1-15 * description, paragraphs [0165]-[0190] *; | [A]CN104641250 (QUALCOMM INC) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]US2016255620 (LI QINGHUA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]US9876614 (SUN YAKUN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A] - Wu-jun HU,Lin YANG , "Modified SLM Algorithm Based on Cyclic Shift and Signal Combination in MIMO-OFDM System", Journal on Communications, (20150415), vol. 36, no. 4, doi:10.11959/j.issn.1000-436x.2015088, ISSN 1000-436X, pages 1 - 8, XP055850711 [A] 1-15 * entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.11959/j.issn.1000-436x.2015088 | [A] - HIKOSAKA, Yuichiro et al., "Effects of Open-loop Transmit Diversity Schemes with Four Antennas on Control Signals Using Cyclic-Shift CDMA", IEEE The 15th International Symposium on Wireless Personal Multimedia Communications, (20121231), doi:20200630114922, XP032294351 [A] 1-15 * entire document * | [A] - SONG, Jin-Hyuk et al., "A Simple Cooperative Cyclic Delay Diversity in Wireless Networks", IEEE 2008 Australasian Telecommunication Networks and Applications Conference, (20081210), doi:20200630115018A, XP031424705 [A] 1-15 * entire document * |