EP3953105 - ANIONIC POLISHING PADS FORMED BY PRINTING PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRIDHAR, Uma c/o Applied Materials, Inc. Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 02 /
GANAPATHIAPPAN, Sivapackia c/o Applied Materials, Inc. Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 03 /
CHOCKALINGAM, Ashwin c/o Applied Materials, Inc. Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 04 /
LUO, Yingdong c/o Applied Materials, Inc. Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 05 /
REDFIELD, Daniel c/o Applied Materials, Inc. Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 06 /
BAJAJ, Rajeev c/o Applied Materials, Inc. Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 07 /
PATIBANDLA, Nag B. c/o Applied Materials, Inc. Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 08 /
NG, Hou T. c/o Applied Materials, Inc. Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 09 /
MADHUSOODHANAN, Sudhakar c/o Applied Materials, Inc. Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2022/29] |
Former [2022/07] | 01 /
SRIDHAR, Uma c/o Applied Materials, Inc., Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | ||
02 /
GANAPATHIAPPAN, Sivapackia c/o Applied Materials, Inc., Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | |||
03 /
CHOCKALINGAM, Ashwin c/o Applied Materials, Inc., Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | |||
04 /
LUO, Yingdong c/o Applied Materials, Inc., Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | |||
05 /
REDFIELD, Daniel c/o Applied Materials, Inc., Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | |||
06 /
BAJAJ, Rajeev c/o Applied Materials, Inc., Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | |||
07 /
PATIBANDLA, Nag B. c/o Applied Materials, Inc., Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | |||
08 /
NG, Hou T. c/o Applied Materials, Inc., Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | |||
09 /
MADHUSOODHANAN, Sudhakar c/o Applied Materials, Inc., Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 20787430.6 | 10.03.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020US21920 | Priority number, date | US201962832881P | 12.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962832881 P | US201916668961 | 30.10.2019 Original published format: US201916668961 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020209965 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3953105 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3953105 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B24B37/24, B24D18/00, B29C64/112, B33Y10/00, B33Y70/00, C09D11/38, C09D11/107, C09D11/101, B33Y70/10, B33Y80/00 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
B24B37/245 (EP,US);
B24B37/24 (KR);
C09D11/38 (EP,US);
B24D18/0045 (KR);
B29C64/112 (KR,US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,KR,US);
B33Y70/00 (EP,KR,US);
B33Y70/10 (EP);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
C09D11/101 (EP,US);
C09D11/107 (EP,US);
B29K2033/08 (US);
B29L2031/736 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/07] | B24B37/24, B24D18/00, B29C64/112, B33Y10/00, B33Y70/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCH DRUCKVERFAHREN GEFORMTE ANIONISCHE POLIERKISSEN | [2022/07] | English: | ANIONIC POLISHING PADS FORMED BY PRINTING PROCESSES | [2022/07] | French: | TAMPONS DE POLISSAGE ANIONIQUES FORMÉS PAR PROCÉDÉS D'IMPRESSION | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 19.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016060712 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US2018339401 (REDFIELD DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2019028324 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1-15* example -; claim - * | International search | [Y]US2006096179 (LU BIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15; | [Y]JP2007235001 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [Y] 1-15; | [A]JP2016115809 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-15; | [Y]US2017203406 (GANAPATHIAPPAN SIVAPACKIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-15; | [A]WO2018030006 (FUJIMI INC [JP])[A] 1-15 | by applicant | US2017203406 |