EP3954674 - AZEOTROPIC OR AZEOTROPIC-LIKE COMPOSITION COMPRISING HYDROGEN FLUORIDE AND 1,1,2-TRIFLUOROETHANE, 1-CHLORO-2,2-DIFLUOROETHANE, OR 1,2-DICHLORO-1-FLUOROETHANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South, 1-13-1 Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-Shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2023/03] |
Former [2022/07] | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Kazuhiro c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 20787991.7 | 09.04.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020JP15962 | Priority number, date | JP20190075126 | 10.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019075126 | [2022/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020209329 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3954674 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07C19/08, C07C17/383, C07C19/12, B01D3/14, B01D3/36, C01B7/19, C08J9/12, C08J9/14, C09K5/04 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
B01D3/36 (EP,US);
C09K5/04 (KR);
A62D1/0057 (US);
B01D3/143 (EP,US);
C01B7/191 (EP);
C01B7/196 (EP);
C01B9/08 (KR);
C07C17/383 (EP,KR,US);
C07C19/08 (KR);
C07C19/12 (KR);
C08J9/127 (EP,US);
C08J9/14 (KR);
C08J9/146 (EP,US);
C09K3/1472 (US);
C09K3/30 (KR,US);
C09K5/045 (EP,US);
C11D7/5018 (US);
C11D7/5036 (US);
H01B3/56 (US);
C08J2203/142 (EP,US);
C08J2203/182 (EP,US);
C08J9/144 (EP);
C09K2205/122 (US);
C09K2205/22 (US);
C09K2205/32 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/383, C07C19/08 (EP);
C07C17/383, C07C19/12 (EP) |
Former IPC [2022/07] | C07C19/08, C07C17/383, C07C19/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | AZEOTROPE ODER AZEOTROPÄHNLICHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT FLUORWASSERSTOFF UND 1,1,2-TRIFLUORETHAN, 1-CHLORO-2,2-DIFLUORETHAN ODER 1,2-DICHLORO-1-FLUORETHAN | [2022/07] | English: | AZEOTROPIC OR AZEOTROPIC-LIKE COMPOSITION COMPRISING HYDROGEN FLUORIDE AND 1,1,2-TRIFLUOROETHANE, 1-CHLORO-2,2-DIFLUOROETHANE, OR 1,2-DICHLORO-1-FLUOROETHANE | [2022/07] | French: | COMPOSITION AZÉOTROPIQUE OU DE TYPE AZÉOTROPIQUE COMPRENANT DU FLUORURE D'HYDROGÈNE ET DU 1,1,2-TRIFLUOROÉTHANE, DU 1-CHLORO-2,2-DIFLUOROÉTHANE, OU DU 1,2-DICHLORO-1-FLUOROÉTHANE | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2021 | Translation filed | 20.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 15.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5180860 (FERNANDEZ RICHARD E [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * example 2 *; | [X]FR3014099 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1,2,7 * claim 1 *; | [X]JP2016130236 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraph [0046] *; | [X]FR3067347 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1,2,7 * claim 2 *; | [E]EP3919467 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [E] 1* claim 6 * | International search | [A]JP2016130236 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-7; | [X]JP2017501992 [X] 3-7; | [X]WO2018060576 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]) [X] 3-7 * Revendications, *; | [X]WO2018069609 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]) [X] 3-4, 7 * Revendications, Exemples *; | [PX]WO2019216239 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP])[PX] 1-4, 7; | [X] - MCBEE, E. T. et al., "Fluorinated derivatives of ethane", Industrial and Engineering Chemistry, (19470000), vol. 39, no. 3, ISSN 0019-7866, pages 409 - 412, XP055734957 [X] 1-4, 7 * , especially p.411-412 p.411-412 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie50447a637 | by applicant | WO9411460 |