EP3951178 - RECIPROCATING COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IHI Rotating Machinery Engineering Co., Ltd. 7-12, Shinonome 1-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0062 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UKAI, Kouji c/o IHI Rotating Machinery Engineering Co., Ltd. 7-12, Shinonome 1-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0062 / JP | 02 /
MATSUBARA, Yosuke c/o IHI Rotating Machinery Engineering Co., Ltd. 7-12, Shinonome 1-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0062 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
UKAI, Kouji Tokyo 135-0062 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUBARA, Yosuke Tokyo 135-0062 / JP | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 20788582.3 | 10.02.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP05190 | Priority number, date | JP20190074035 | 09.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019074035 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020208930 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3951178 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/06, F04B39/12, F04B5/02, F04B15/08, F04B27/02, F04B27/04, F04B53/02, F04B53/08, F04B53/14 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
F04B53/146 (EP,US);
F04B39/06 (KR,US);
F04B39/10 (KR,US);
F04B15/08 (EP,US);
F04B27/02 (EP);
F04B27/0442 (EP);
F04B39/0005 (KR);
F04B39/041 (US);
F04B39/064 (EP,US);
F04B39/12 (KR,US);
F04B39/121 (US);
F04B5/02 (EP);
F04B53/02 (EP);
F04B53/08 (EP,US);
F04B53/16 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | F04B39/06, F04B39/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | HUBKOLBENVERDICHTER | [2022/06] | English: | RECIPROCATING COMPRESSOR | [2022/06] | French: | COMPRESSEUR ALTERNATIF | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2021 | Translation filed | 02.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 16.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3220202 (GOTTZMANN CHRISTIAN F); | [XI]EP1767783 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [XI]JP2012163105 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) | International search | [XYA]JPH08261143 (CRYOGENIC GROUP INC [US]); | [Y]JP2013068114 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD); | [XYA]KR20160000138 (HYUPSUNG METALLIZE CO LTD [KR]); | [XYA]JP2017020365 (MAEKAWA SEISAKUSHO KK); | [Y]CN207004829U (GUANGDONG MEIZHI COMPRESSOR CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2008232351 |