EP4041442 - MIXING SYSTEM FOR FIRE EXTINGUISHING SYSTEMS, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A MIXING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firedos GmbH Auf der Kaulbahn 6 61200 Wölfersheim / DE | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HULINSKY, Andreas Kaitzer Str. 42 01187 Dresden / DE | 02 /
ZIMMERMANN, Fritz Baumstrasse 16 89547 Gerstetten / DE | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20789024.5 | 02.10.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020EP77617 | Priority number, date | DE201910215406 | 08.10.2019 Original published format: DE102019215406 | [2022/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021069313 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4041442 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4041442 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01F23/451, B01F23/40, B01F35/83, A62C5/00, A62C5/02 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
B01F23/451 (EP);
A62C5/00 (CN);
A62C5/002 (US);
A62C5/02 (EP,CN,US);
B01F23/49 (EP);
B01F35/831 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | B01F3/08, B01F15/04, A62C5/00, A62C5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUMISCHSYSTEM FÜR FEUERLÖSCHANLAGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES SOLCHEN ZUMISCHSYSTEMS | [2023/43] | English: | MIXING SYSTEM FOR FIRE EXTINGUISHING SYSTEMS, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A MIXING SYSTEM | [2022/33] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MÉLANGE DESTINÉ À DES SYSTÈMES D'EXTINCTION D'INCENDIE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN TEL SYSTÈME DE MÉLANGE | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/33] | ZUMISCHSYSTEM FÜR FEUERLÖSCHANLAGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB SOLCHES ZUMISCHSYSTEMS | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 30.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 29.11.2023 | |
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HR | 29.11.2023 | |
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3131522 (KORNFELD JUERGEN DIPL ING); | [A]EP0296652 (SNAM PROGETTI [IT], et al); | [A]EP0647458 (ROSENBAUER INT AG [AT]) |