EP4038790 - GROUP-BASED ACKNOWLEDGMENT FEEDBACK FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS IN THE PRESENCE OF SEMI-PERSISTENT SCHEDULING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHOSHNEVISAN, Mostafa 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
SUN, Jing 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxia 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
BHATTAD, Kapil 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6, D06 F9C7 / IE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 20789324.9 | 22.09.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020US52044 | Priority number, date | IN201941039480 | 30.09.2019 Original published format: IN201941039480 | US202017027337 | 21.09.2020 Original published format: US202017027337 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021067073 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4038790 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
H04L1/1864 (EP,CN,KR);
H04L1/1861 (EP,CN,KR);
H04L5/0094 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W72/23 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/08 (CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1854 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Title | German: | GRUPPENBASIERTE BESTÄTIGUNGSRÜCKKOPPLUNG FÜR DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATION IN GEGENWART VON SEMIPERSISTENTER PLANUNG | [2022/32] | English: | GROUP-BASED ACKNOWLEDGMENT FEEDBACK FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS IN THE PRESENCE OF SEMI-PERSISTENT SCHEDULING | [2022/32] | French: | RÉTROACTION D'ACCUSÉ DE RÉCEPTION BASÉE SUR UN GROUPE POUR DES COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL EN PRÉSENCE D'UNE PLANIFICATION SEMI-PERSISTANTE | [2022/32] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 09.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2011040771 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al); | [X]US2018302128 (AKKARAKARAN SONY [US], et al); | [X]CN110034902 (BEIJING SPREADTRUM HIGH TECH COMMUNICATIONS TECH CO LTD); | [X]WO2019160483 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) |